Global Patent Index - EP 0994247 A2

EP 0994247 A2 2000-04-19 - Valve arrangement for the control of a recirculated exhaust gas flow

Title (en)

Valve arrangement for the control of a recirculated exhaust gas flow

Title (de)

Ventilanordnung zur Steuerung eines rückgeführten Abgasstromes

Title (fr)

Arrangement d'une soupape pour la commande d'un flux de gaz d'échappement recyclé

Publication

EP 0994247 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99101651 A

Priority

DE 19812702 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19812702A1] The valve device has two valve seats (12,13), each associated with a valve closure element (16), operated by a common operating mechanism (17) via a setting element (21). The valve closure elements are biased in the closure direction by springs (28,29) and the gas pressure of the exhaust gas flow.

Abstract (de)

Erfindungsgemäß wird zur Steuerung eines extern rückgeführten Abgasstromes an einer Brennkraftmaschine ein Doppelsitzventil vorgeschlagen, welches zwei Ventilsitzen (12, 13) zugeordnete Verschlußglieder (16) an einer gemeinsamen Betätigungsstange (18) eines Betätigungsmechanismus (17) aufweist. Mittels eines einzigen Stellorganes (21) kann mit der Ventilanordnung die Abgasrückführung vollständig gesperrt werden oder Abgas wird über einen einen Abgaskühler (5) aufweisenden Strömungspfad (10) einer Luftleitung (3) zugeführt oder rückgeführtes Abgas wird unter Umgehung des Abgaskühlers (5) über einen Bypass (7) der Luftleitung (3) zugeführt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 26/71 (2016.02); F02M 26/26 (2016.02); F02M 26/68 (2016.02); F02M 26/28 (2016.02); F02M 26/30 (2016.02); F02M 26/67 (2016.02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19812702 A1 19990930; EP 0994247 A2 20000419; EP 0994247 A3 20010411; EP 0994247 B1 20040728

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160205

2016-11-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160205

2016-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59910053

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-12-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GUSTAV WAHLER GMBH U. CO. KG, VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, , DE

- Document: DE 59910053

- Effective date: 20141125

2014-12-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BORGWARNER ESSLINGEN GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VOLKSWAGEN AG, 38440 WOLFSBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59910053

- Effective date: 20131128

2014-12-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BORGWARNER ESSLINGEN GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GUSTAV WAHLER GMBH U. CO. KG, VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, , DE

- Document: DE 59910053

- Effective date: 20141125

2014-12-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VOLKSWAGEN AG, 38440 WOLFSBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59910053

- Effective date: 20131128

2014-12-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: GUSTAV WAHLER GMBH U. CO. KG, 73730 ESSLINGEN, DE; VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 38440 WOLFSBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59910053

- Effective date: 20141125

2014-12-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BORGWARNER ESSLINGEN GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: GUSTAV WAHLER GMBH U. CO. KG, 73730 ESSLINGEN, DE; VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 38440 WOLFSBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59910053

- Effective date: 20141125

2014-12-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59910053

- Representative's name: TWELMEIER MOMMER & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSA, DE

- Effective date: 20141125

2014-12-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59910053

- Representative's name: TWELMEIER MOMMER & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSA, DE

- Effective date: 20140717

2014-12-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59910053

- Representative's name: TWELMEIER MOMMER & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSA, DE

- Effective date: 20131128

2014-11-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59910053

- Representative's name: TWELMEIER MOMMER & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSA, DE

2014-07-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59910053

- Representative's name: TWELMEIER MOMMER & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSA, DE

2013-11-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59910053

- Representative's name: TWELMEIER MOMMER & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSA, DE

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-04-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041108

2004-10-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041028

2004-10-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040921

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910053 P 20040902

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GUSTAV WAHLER GMBH U. CO.KG

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI