Global patent index - EP 0994250 A2

EP 0994250 A2 2000-04-19 - High-pressure sensor

Title (en)

High-pressure sensor

Title (de)

Hochdruck-Sensor

Title (fr)

Détecteur à haute pression

Publication

EP 0994250 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99810565 A

Priority

CH 150098 A

Abstract (en)

The sensor has a balloon-shaped measurement chamber divided into a pressure head part (23) with larger dia. and a pressure neck part (24) with smaller dia. and welded to a threaded body (16). The joint (15) between the measurement head and the threaded body is designed to have no weld gaps on the pressure side which could lead to migrating cracks as a result of the notch effect. An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for implementing the method.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf einen Hochdruck-Sensor, insbesondere zur Überwachung pulsierender hydraulischer Druckimpulse, z.B. in Einspritzsystemen von Verbrennungsmotoren. Sie ist gekennzeichnet durch einen ballonartig gestalteten Druckraum vor der Membranpartie (21), wodurch sich optimale Messsignale gleichzeitig mit erheblich reduzierten mechanischen Kräften in der Schweissverbindung (15) kombinieren lassen. Zusätzlich werden Schweissverfahren vorgeschlagen, welche eine spaltfreie Innen-Schweisszone (34) erreichen lassen, wodurch Kerbwirkungen und dadurch entstehend Wanderrisse vermieden werden, welche zu Brüchen führen können. Als optimale Verbindung zwischen Messkopf (14) und Gewindekörper (16) wird eine Zweistufen-Schweissung vorgeschlagen: Zuerst eine Innenschweissung mit Elektrostauchschweissung, anschliessend Aussenschweissung mittels Elektrodenstrahl-, Schutzgas- oder Laserschweissunmg. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 63/00; F15B 13/042

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994250 A2 20000419; EP 0994250 A3 20000809; EP 0994250 B1 20030423; AT 238536 T 20030515; CH 693490 A5 20030829; DE 59905161 D1 20030528; US 6092426 A 20000725

INPADOC legal status

2015-05-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-05-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59905161

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140701

2015-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 238536

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140701

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59905161

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130722

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130711

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130722

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040126

2003-11-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-10-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KISTLER HOLDING AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-07-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905161

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 01L 9/00 A, 7G 01L 23/08 B

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR GB

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 01L 9/00 A, 7G 01L 23/08 B, 7B 23K 9/00 -, 7B 23K 15/00 -, 7B 23K 26/00 -, 7F 02M 63/00 -, 7F 15B 13/042 -

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI