Global Patent Index - EP 0994251 A1

EP 0994251 A1 2000-04-19 - Fuel injection system

Title (en)

Fuel injection system

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'injection de combustible

Publication

EP 0994251 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99308004 A

Priority

GB 9822653 A

Abstract (en)

A fuel system comprising a fuel injector having a delivery chamber (16) for fuel and a valve needle (15) engageable with a seating to control fuel delivery through an outlet opening (17). The fuel system includes a control valve (21), for controlling communication between a source of pressurised fuel (10) and the delivery chamber (16), and a pressure regulator (26), the pressure regulator being arranged to hold the fuel pressure in the delivery chamber (16) at a predetermined value when the control valve (21) occupies a position in which communication between the source (10) and the delivery chamber (16) is broken. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 63/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994251 A1 20000419; GB 9822653 D0 19981209

INPADOC legal status


2001-03-28 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20001114

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI