Global Patent Index - EP 0994252 A3

EP 0994252 A3 2000-11-08 - Compressor for the production of oil free air

Title (en)

Compressor for the production of oil free air

Title (de)

Kompressor zur Erzeugung ölfreier Druckluft

Title (fr)

Compresseur pour la production d'air sans lubrifiant

Publication

EP 0994252 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99119190 A

Priority

DE 19847159 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0994252A2] The compressor has a drive mechanism driven by a drive shaft (3) with a swash plate (5) and lubricated by oil and connected via piston rods to a piston operating reciprocally wrt. an oil-cooled cylinder head (7). The oil used to cool the pressurized side of the compressor completely sealed wrt. the compressed air is also used for drive side lubrication. The oil for cooling and lubrication is a permanent, encapsulated oil quantity circulated within the compressor housing. The interior of the housing is divided by a non-return valve (39,41) opening in the oil circulation direction into the pressure region contg. the cylinder head and piston and the drive region contg. the drive shaft and swash plate. A pump feeds the oil between the pressure and drive regions according to the flow direction defined by the non-return valve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 27/10; F04B 39/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/109 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994252 A2 20000419; EP 0994252 A3 20001108; EP 0994252 B1 20060913; DE 19847159 A1 20000420; DE 19847159 C2 20011206; DE 59913849 D1 20061026; US 6318502 B1 20011120

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131007

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131008

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131007

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59913849

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131007

2014-06-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121023

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070614

2007-04-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-01-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-12-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061115

2006-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913849 P 20061026

2006-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2006-09-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-09-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060913

2002-07-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KNORR-BREMSE SYSTEME FUER NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH

2002-07-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: UNGER, HANS

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010319

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 27/10 A, 7F 04B 39/06 B

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI