Global Patent Index - EP 0994256 A1

EP 0994256 A1 2000-04-19 - Stator for Moineau pump

Title (en)

Stator for Moineau pump

Title (de)

Stator für Exzenterschneckenpumpen

Title (fr)

Stator pour pompe moineau

Publication

EP 0994256 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115974 A

Priority

DE 19847406 A

Abstract (en)

An eccentric screw pump stator (1), comprising a removable elastomeric body (2) fitted with a conical outer part (3) surrounded by a conforming support casing (4), is new. The/each outer part is conical and its outside diameter decreases from the stator suction side to the pressure side, and the inside diameter of the support casing varies in accordance with the conicity of the outer part(s). A stator insert (1), for an eccentric screw pump, comprises a removable cylindrical elastomeric body (2) fitted with one or more outer parts (3) surrounded by a support casing (4), in which the elastomeric body has an internal axially extending pump cavity (5) for receiving a rotor and external peripheral projections (6) and/or recesses which engage corresponding recesses and/or projections of the outer part(s).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Einschubstator für Exzenterschneckenpumpen mit einem herausnehmbaren, im wesentlichen zylindrischen Elastomerkörper, wenigstens einem an der Aussenoberfläche des Elastomerkörpers anliegenden Außenteil und einem das wenigstens eine Außenteil umgebenden Stützmantel. Elastomerkörper und Außenteil weisen Erhebungen und/oder Vertiefungen auf, die formschlüssig ineinander eingreifen. Das wenigstens eine Außenteil ist konisch ausgebildet und zwar derart, daß sein Außendurchmesser von der Saugseite des Stators zu dessen Druckseite hin zunimmt. Der Innendurchmesser des Stützmantels ändert sich entsprechend der Konizität des Außenteils. Diese Anordnung ermöglicht ein einfaches Nachspannen des Stators und ein leichtes Auswechseln des Elastomerkörpers. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/107

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/107 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/1075 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] DE 29516885 U1 19960201 - GUMASOL WERKE DR MAYER STIFTUN [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994256 A1 20000419; DE 19847406 A1 20000427; DE 19847406 C2 20010208

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041221

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030709

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000225

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI