Global patent index - EP 0994261 A2

EP 0994261 A2 2000-04-19 - Arrangement for hydraulically actuating a roof, boot lid or similar

Title (en)

Arrangement for hydraulically actuating a roof, boot lid or similar

Title (de)

Anordnung zur hydraulischen Betätigung eines Verdecks, eines Heckdeckels od. dgl.

Title (fr)

Ensemble pour l'actionnement hydraulique d'une capote, d'un hayon arrière, ou similaire

Publication

EP 0994261 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99890288 A

Priority

AT 172598 A

Abstract (en)

In order to fasten the lid and operate it in at least one direction on an emergency basis, the two work chambers (2,3) of the lids are joined to one another by a connecting pipe (12), which contains a blockable check valve (13). The valve constituent of the check valve is blockable by a hydraulically-operated control piston with a larger surface than a valve seat. A throttle (15) is installed in the pipe (4) leading to one of the work chambers of the work cylinders. The unblockable check valve opens in its unblocked state in the direction of the rod side (2) of the work cylinders on the piston side (3).

Abstract (de)

Eine Anordnung zur hydraulischen Betätigung eines Verdecks od. dgl. an einem Fahrzeug, ist mit zumindest einem doppeltwir kenden hydraulischen Arbeitszylinder versehen, dessen Arbeitsräume mit jeweils einer Seite einer umschaltbaren Druckquelle in Verbin dung stehen. Um auf einfache und sichere Weise eine Fixierung und anschließende Notbetätigung beispielsweise des Verdecks in zumindest einer Richtung zu ermöglichen, sind die beiden Arbeitsräume (2, 3) des oder jedes Arbeitszylinders (1) über eine Verbindungsleitung (12, 24) miteinander verbunden, in der ein sperrbares Rück schlagventil (13; 25, 26) eingesetzt ist, dessen Ventilelement (26) über einen hydraulisch betätigten Steuerkolben (29) mit größerer Fläche als der Ventilsitz (25) sperrbar ist: daß in der Hydraulikleitung (4, 22) zu einem der Arbeitsräume des oder jedes Arbeitszylinders eine Drossel (15, 27) eingesetzt ist, die Verbindungsleitung (12, 24) zwischen dieser Drossel und dem oder jedem Arbeitszylinder ansetzt und die Steuerleitung (14, 28) für das sperrbare Rückschlagventil (13; 25. 26) zwischen der Druckquelle (7) und der Drossel (15) ansetzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 20/00; F15B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 7/00 (2006.01); F15B 13/02 (2006.01); F15B 13/10 (2006.01); F15B 20/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 7/006 (2013.01); F15B 7/003 (2013.01); F15B 13/021 (2013.01); F15B 13/10 (2013.01); F15B 20/004 (2013.01); F15B 2211/20561 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994261 A2 20000419; EP 0994261 A3 20010725; AT 406357 B 20000425; AT A172598 A 19990915

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-29 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-04-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020121

2001-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI