Global Patent Index - EP 0994294 A2

EP 0994294 A2 2000-04-19 - Lighting apparatus to be mounted to a first wall defining a light emitting window

Title (en)

Lighting apparatus to be mounted to a first wall defining a light emitting window

Title (de)

Beleuchtungsvorrichtung zur Anbringung an einer ersten, eine Lichtaustrittsebene definierenden Wand

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'éclairage pour la fixation sur une première paroi définissant une surface d'émission de lumière

Publication

EP 0994294 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119819 A

Priority

DE 19846726 A

Abstract (en)

The light fitting (10) has a HV halogen lamp (17) enclosed by a spot reflector (19), positioned at one focal point (P1) of a elliptical reflector (24), a light output opening (21) positioned at the other focal point (P2) of the elliptical reflector and a lens (27) extending at an angle to the light output opening.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Beleuchtungsvorrichtung (10) zur Anbringung an einer ersten, eine Lichtaustrittsebene (E) definierenden Wand (11), insbesondere an einer Decke, sowie zur gleichmäßigen Ausleuchtung einer großflächigen und unter einem Winkel, insbesondere einem 90°-Winkel, zu der ersten Wand (11) stehenden zweiten Wand (12), umfassend eine Lichtquelle (17), die im Bereich des ersten Brennpunktes (P1) eines im wesentlichen elipsoidförmigen Reflektorelementes (24) angeordnet ist, eine Linsenanordnung (26), die eine bezüglich der Lichtaustrittsebene (E) geneigte Spreizlinse (27) umfaßt, und eine Lichtaustrittsöffnung (21), in der der zweite Brennpunkt (P2) des Reflektorelementes (24) angeordnet ist. Die Besonderheit der Beleuchtungsvorrichtung (10) besteht darin, daß die Lichtquelle (17) eine freistrahlende Hochvolt-Halogen Lampe ist, die innerhalb eines parabolförmigen Spotreflektors (16) angeordnet ist, wobei die Längsachse (L) der Lampe (17) im wesentlichen senkrecht zu der Mittelachse (M) des Spotreflektors (16) steht, daß der erste Brennpunkt (P1) des Reflektorelementes (24) mit dem Brennpunkt des Spotreflektors (16) zusammenfällt, und daß der Spotreflektor (16) eine von der Lampe (17) zumindest teilweise durchgriffene Öffnung (19) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/02 (2006.01); F21V 7/09 (2006.01); F21V 13/04 (2006.01); F21V 17/02 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 29/00 (2006.01); F21Y 101/00 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 29/71 (2013.01); F21S 8/026 (2013.01); F21V 7/0025 (2013.01); F21V 7/09 (2013.01); F21V 13/04 (2013.01); F21V 17/02 (2013.01); F21V 19/0005 (2013.01); F21V 29/004 (2013.01); F21V 29/76 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994294 A2 20000419; EP 0994294 A3 20030122; EP 0994294 B1 20050615; AT 298065 T 20050715; DE 19846726 A1 20000420; DE 59912178 D1 20050721; DK 0994294 T3 20050704; ES 2242339 T3 20051101

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091008

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091008

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091007

2011-03-14 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091007

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091007

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-06-07 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-06-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-05-26 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ERCO LEUCHTEN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20091031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081021

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080929

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081023

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20081010

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080923

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071214

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-11-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051123

2005-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2242339 T3

2005-10-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-07 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051007

2005-09-15 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050915

2005-09-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MOINAS & SAVOYE SA

2005-07-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-07-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912178 P 20050721

2005-07-04 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-06-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-06-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-06-15 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050615

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031111

2003-10-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2003-01-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21S 8/02 A, 7F 21V 7/09 B, 7F 21V 13/04 B, 7F 21V 17/02 B, 7F 21V 29/00 B, 7F 21Y 101/00 B, 7F 21Y 101:00 Z

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI