Global Patent Index - EP 0994298 A2

EP 0994298 A2 2000-04-19 - Pivotable locking device

Title (en)

Pivotable locking device

Title (de)

Gelenkverschluss

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage articulé

Publication

EP 0994298 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99117158 A

Priority

DE 19847761 A

Abstract (en)

The closure catch has a fixing element (2) for securing the closure catch to the edge of a housing component, a central pressure section (3) and a catch lever (4), with film hinges (5,6) between the fixing element and the central pressure section and between the latter and the catch lever. The fixing element has projecting elements (12,13) fitting into locating slots provided by the housing component and a snap-action hook (11) cooperating with the edge of the housing component

Abstract (de)

Ein einstückig gebildeter Gelenkverschluss (1) mit einem Befestigungsteil (2) an einem Gehäuse (23), einem mittleren Druckteil (3 ) und einem Verschlussbügel (4), die miteinander durch Filmscharniere (5,6) verbunden sind, weist überdimensionierte schlaufenbildende Filmscharniere (5,6) auf, um Zug- und Druckkräfte auf diese zu vermindern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 31/00; F21V 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16C 11/04 (2006.01); F21V 17/20 (2006.01); F21V 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 31/005 (2013.01); F21V 17/20 (2013.01); F21V 31/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994298 A2 20000419; EP 0994298 A3 20020313; DE 19847761 C1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060401

2002-12-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 31/00 A, 7F 21V 17/00 B, 7B 65D 45/18 B

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI