Global Patent Index - EP 0994300 A1

EP 0994300 A1 2000-04-19 - Burner for operating a heat generator

Title (en)

Burner for operating a heat generator

Title (de)

Brenner für den Betrieb eines Wärmeerzeugers

Title (fr)

Brûleur pour la conduite d'un générateur de chaleur

Publication

EP 0994300 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811023 A

Priority

EP 98811023 A

Abstract (en)

The burner comprises a generator (100) for a combustion air flow, an arrangement for feeding at least one fuel into the combustion air flow and a mixing path (220) downstream of the spin generator. The mixing path contains several transition channels for passing a flow formed in the spin generator into a mixing tube (20) downstream of the transition channels. A pilot burner system (300) in the lower region of the mixer tube interacts with turbulence generators (400) mounted on the end of the mixer tube.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Brenner zum Betrieb eines Wärmeerzeugers, welcher Brenner im wesentlichen besteht aus einem Drallerzeuger (100) für einen Verbrennungsluftstrom (115), aus Mitteln zur Eindüsung mindestens eines Brennstoffes (112, 116) in den Verbrennungsluftstrom, aus einer Anzahl Uebergangskanäle (201) zur Ueberführung einer im Drallerzeuger gebildeten Strömung in ein stromab dieser Uebergangskanäle nachgeschaltetes Mischrohr (20), wird im unteren Bereich dieses Mischrohres (20) ein Pilotbrennersystem (300) angeordnet ist, wobei das Pilotbrennersystem (300) in Wirkverbindung mit endseitig des Mischrohres (20) angeordneten Wirbelgeneratoren (400) steht. Das Zusammenwirken zwischen Pilotbrennersystem und Wirbelgeneratoren sorgt für eine Maximierung der Flammenstabilität im Brennraum (30) und eine allgemeine Minimierung der Schadstoff-Emissionen, unter Vergrösserung des Lastbereiches bei tiefen Schadstoffen zu kleinen Lasten hin. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 11/40; F23C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/00 (2006.01); F23D 11/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/002 (2013.01); F23D 11/402 (2013.01); F23C 2900/07002 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0780629 A2 19970625 - ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994300 A1 20000419; EP 0994300 B1 20031126; DE 59810284 D1 20040108; US 6152726 A 20001128

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170824 AND 20170830

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD, CH

- Effective date: 20161110

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59810284

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59810284

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-12-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-11-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-01-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2004-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810284 P 20040108

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-11-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI