Global Patent Index - EP 0994305 A3

EP 0994305 A3 2001-03-28 - Fireplace cassette with gas pressure spring for operating a fire door

Title (en)

Fireplace cassette with gas pressure spring for operating a fire door

Title (de)

Cheminée-Einsatz mit Gasdruckfeder für die Betätigung der Feuerraumtüre

Title (fr)

Cassette de cheminée à ressort à gaz sous pression pour actionner la porte du foyer

Publication

EP 0994305 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99120237 A

Priority

CH 208098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0994305A2] The force for lifting up the door or doors (3) is applied by at least one gas compression spring (11) with damper mounted in a ventilated chamber (15) of the insert (1). The gas compression spring is preferably designed to produce a force which exceeds the weight of the door. One spring can be provided on each side of the furnace chamber (2) in a ventilated chamber. The ventilated chamber can be accessed from the front or side.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24B 1/192

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24B 1/192 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24B 1/192 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] DE 29615620 U1 19961031 - CERA DESIGN BY BRITTA VON TASC [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994305 A2 20000419; EP 0994305 A3 20010328

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010929

2002-01-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI