Global patent index - EP 0994307 A1

EP 0994307 A1 2000-04-19 - Gas-operated infrared-ray heater with folding arm

Title (en)

Gas-operated infrared-ray heater with folding arm

Title (de)

Infrarotgasheizung mit Klapparm

Title (fr)

Radiateur à gaz à rayons infra-rouges avec un bras pliant

Publication

EP 0994307 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830543 A

Priority

IT PR980014 U

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to the sector of gas-operated infrared-ray heaters, comprising a flat heating surface (2) located at the end of a cantilever arm (3) supported by a support arm (4). The position of the heating surface (2) may be varied between a high position (3a) in which the heating surface is substantially horizontal, a low position (3b), a position in which the heating surface is directed upwards and a stowed-away position (3c) via means (5) for directing the cantilever arm (3), comprising an intermediate articulation (6) and a hinged joint (7) between the cantilever arm (3) and the support arm (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 3/14; F24C 15/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/14 (2006.01); F24C 15/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/14 (2013.01); F24C 15/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994307 A1 20000419; IT 250835 Y1 20031014; IT PR980014 U1 20000417

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030725

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030314

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI