Global Patent Index - EP 0994309 A2

EP 0994309 A2 2000-04-19 - Withdrawal device for food support in a baking oven

Title (en)

Withdrawal device for food support in a baking oven

Title (de)

Aufzugsvorrichtung für Gargutträger im Garraum von Garöfen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de coulissement pour support d'alimentation dans un four de cuisson

Publication

EP 0994309 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99117501 A

Priority

DE 19847727 A

Abstract (en)

The preferably telescopic mechanism has the food support resting on or securable to rails (6) that can be pulled at least partly out of the oven. The rails and/or guides (4) include glide surfaces (12) made from a material resistant to the working temperature of the oven.

Abstract (de)

Teleskopauszugsvorrichtung für Gargutträger (5, 5') im Backofen (2) von Haushaltsbacköfen, wobei die in verschiedenen Backraumebenen bewegbaren Gargutträger unter Verwendung von in Führungen (4) gleitende Teleskopschienen (6) aus dem Backofen (2) bzw. Backraum (1) herausziehbar sind. Zwecks Verbesserung und Aufrechterhaltung der Gleitfähigkeit auf Dauer sind die Teleskopschienen (6) oder die Führungen (4) mit einem temperaturfesten und nicht verflüchtigenden Gleitmittel versehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/168 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3544582 C2 19880811

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994309 A2 20000419; EP 0994309 A3 20000816; EP 0994309 B1 20040512; DE 19847727 A1 20000427; DE 19847727 C2 20000928; ES 2218916 T3 20041116

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050831

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060905

2007-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060905

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060904

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060904

2006-10-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061002

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060919

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050906

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050831

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-12-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2218916 T3

2004-08-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909456 P 20040617

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021001

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI