Global patent index - EP 0994311 A2

EP 0994311 A2 2000-04-19 - Hydraulic assembly for heating systems also supplying sanitary water, equipped with a hot water tank

Title (en)

Hydraulic assembly for heating systems also supplying sanitary water, equipped with a hot water tank

Title (de)

Hydraulische Baugruppe für Heizungs-und Heisswasseranlagen , mit einem Heisswasserspeicher

Title (fr)

Ensemble hydraulique pour systéme de chauffage mixte, avec accumulateur d'eau chaude

Publication

EP 0994311 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99114717 A

Priority

IT MI982202 A

Abstract (en)

A hydraulic assembly for a heating system also supplying sanitary water and equipped with a hot water tank (3). The assembly comprises a block (10) in which there are formed the seats for the a three-way valve (45) and for an electric linear actuator (27) controlled by a thermostat (36) housed in the tank (4). The three-way valve can compensate a possible excessive length of the stroke of the linear actuator. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/1066 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994311 A2 20000419; EP 0994311 A3 20020918; IT 1302663 B1 20000929; IT MI982202 A1 20000415; IT MI982202 D0 19981014

INPADOC legal status

2004-06-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030606

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030310

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUGAS SPA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI