Global Patent Index - EP 0994312 B1

EP 0994312 B1 2000-08-30 - Room lights with integrated air filter device

Title (en)

Room lights with integrated air filter device

Title (de)

Raumleuchte mit integrierter Raumluftfiltriervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Lampe d'intérieur avec un système de filtrage aérien d'ambiance

Publication

EP 0994312 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811024 A

Priority

EP 98811024 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0994312A1] The light fitting has one or more light sources (20), e.g. incandescent bulbs or fluorescent light tubes and an easily interchangeable light shade (17) which iincorporates an electric fan (2) ,used for passing the room air through a fat filter (23) and/or an active carbon filter (13) for removal of tobacco smoke, with the filtered air fed back into the room.

Abstract (de)

Ein im Schirm (17) integrierter elektrisch betriebener Ventilator (2) saugt die belastete Raumluft an. Die angesaugte Luft wird über einen Fettfilter (23) für fetthaltige Dämpfe von Speisen und/oder über einen Aktivkohlefilter (13) für Rauch, im Besonderen Tabakrauch geführt und dabei grössenteils neutralisiert. Die filtritierte Raumluft wird wieder dem Raum zugeführt. Die verschmutzten Filter (13,23) sind auswechselbar. Die Erfindung ist für Pendel-/Decken- und Stehlampen mit einem oder mehreren Leuchtkörpern (7) konzipiert. Die eigentlichen Lampenschirme (17) in verschiedenen Formen und Materialien sind leicht austauschbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 3/16; F21V 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 33/00 (2006.01); F24F 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 33/0088 (2013.01); F24F 3/1603 (2013.01); F24F 2003/1646 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994312 A1 20000419; EP 0994312 B1 20000830; AT 196001 T 20000915; AT 240493 T 20030515; AU 5965299 A 20000501; CA 2346432 A1 20000420; CZ 20011262 A3 20020313; DE 59800258 D1 20001005; DE 59905576 D1 20030618; EP 1121563 A1 20010808; EP 1121563 B1 20030514; PL 347225 A1 20020325; WO 0022351 A1 20000420

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051014

2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-10-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051014

2004-10-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041012

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041008

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041004

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031014

2002-11-12 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20021112

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021003

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-13 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MANDLI ERWIN

- Effective date: 20001031

2001-04-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19981103;LV PAYMENT 19981103;RO PAYMENT 19981103;SI PAYMENT 19981103

2000-11-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001009

2000-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001014

2000-10-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BREITER + WIEDMER AG

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800258 20001005

2000-09-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT PAYMENT 19981103;LV PAYMENT 19981103;MK;RO PAYMENT 19981103;SI PAYMENT 19981103

2000-08-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196001 T 20000915

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981103

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT PAYMENT 19981103;LV PAYMENT 19981103;MK;RO PAYMENT 19981103;SI PAYMENT 19981103