Global Patent Index - EP 0994313 A1

EP 0994313 A1 2000-04-19 - Method for making a heat exchanger and heat exchanger made by this method

Title (en)

Method for making a heat exchanger and heat exchanger made by this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Wärmetauschers und Wärmetauscher, der durch Anwendung des Verfahrens erhalten wird

Title (fr)

Procédé pour fabriquer un échangeur de chaleur et échangeur de chaleur produit par ce procédé

Publication

EP 0994313 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99203247 A

Priority

NL 1010300 A

Abstract (en)

Metal heat exchanger production, by investment casting using a lost plastic model, is new. A metal heat exchanger is produced by: (a) forming a heat exchanger model of plastic which evaporates at or below the metal melting temperature; (b) coating the model with a gas permeable supporting layer of heat resistant material; and (c) casting molten metal on the model to evaporate the plastic for replacement by the metal. An Independent claim is also included for a heat exchanger produced by the above process.

Abstract (de)

1. Ein Wärmetauscher aus Metall umfaßt einen von einer Wand gebildeten Raum, der mit einer Einlaßöffnung (22) zum Zuführen eines ersten Fluids in den Raum und einer Auslaßöffnung zum Abführen des ersten Fluids aus dem Raum versehen ist. Um den Raum erstreckt sich einen im wesentlichen schraubenförmig Kanal (28) für ein zweites Fluid. Der Raum ist versehen mit einer Anzahl von Vorsprüngen (26), die von der Wand in den Raum ragen. Der Wärmetauscher wird dadurch hergestellt, daß erstens aus einem Kunststoff eine Kopie des Wärmetauschers hergestellt wird, welcher Kunststoff wenigstens bei der Schmelztemperatur des Metalls verdampft. Zweitens werden die Oberflächen der Kopie mit einer gasdurchlässigen, unterstützenden Schicht aus einem hitzebeständigen Material beschichtet. Drittens wird das Metall in flüssigem Zustand auf die Kopie innerhalb der gasdurchlässigen Schicht gegossen, um den Kunststoff zu verdampfen und den von dem Kunststoff eingenommenen Raum mit dem Metall auszufüllen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 1/24; B22C 9/04; B22D 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/04 (2006.01); B22D 25/00 (2006.01); F24H 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 25/00 (2013.01); B22C 9/046 (2013.01); F24H 1/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994313 A1 20000419; EP 0994313 B1 20050302; NL 1010300 C2 20000413

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131004

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131004

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131004

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121025

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121127

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT NL

2005-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050302

2003-04-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030205

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEFIT BUDERUS B.V.

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FR GB IT NL

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT NL

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI