Global Patent Index - EP 0994321 A2

EP 0994321 A2 2000-04-19 - Heat exchanger for fuel fired water heater

Title (en)

Heat exchanger for fuel fired water heater

Title (de)

Wärmeübertrager für brennstoffbeheizte Wassererhitzer

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur pour chauffe-eau chauffé par combustible

Publication

EP 0994321 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120228 A

Priority

  • DE 29818228 U
  • DE 19946604 A

Abstract (en)

The inner peripheries of the passages through the lamellae for the water pipes contain radial slots (22) that divide the periphery into edge segments (24) clamping tight against the pipes. Combustion gases from the burning fuel pass through gaps in between the lamellae to heat water flowing through the pipes.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Wärmeübertrager für brennstoffbeheizte Wassererhitzer, mit wasserführenden Rohren (16) und einem von den Rohren (16) durchsetzten Paket von Lamellen (18), die zwischen sich Spalte (20) zum Durchtritt der Verbrennungsgase bilden. Es wird vorgeschlagen, daß der Randbereich der Durchgangsöffnungen der Lamellen (18) mit von der Durchgangsöffnung ausgehenden, vorzugsweise gleichmäßig über den Umfang verteilten Radialschlitzen (22) versehen ist, die den Randbereich der Durchgangsöffnungen in mehrere Randsegmente (24) unterteilt, die klemmend auf den Rohren (16) aufsitzen. Dadurch ist eine sichere Verbindung zwischen den Lamellen (18) und den wasserführenden Rohren (16) des Wärmeübertragers (14) erreicht, wobei auf den ansonst notwendigen Lötvorgang verzichtet werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 1/32; F24H 1/44; F24H 9/00; F28F 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/44 (2006.01); F24H 9/00 (2006.01); F28F 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/40 (2013.01); F24H 1/26 (2013.01); F24H 1/44 (2013.01); F24H 9/0026 (2013.01); F28F 1/325 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994321 A2 20000419; EP 0994321 A3 20001220; EP 0994321 B1 20040818

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-08-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-03-23 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040818

2005-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-12-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041222

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041129

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910260 P 20040923

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-08-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-08-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-08-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030402

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010620

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI