Global patent index - EP 0994326 A2

EP 0994326 A2 2000-04-19 - Seeking head, in particular for a high speed missile

Title (en)

Seeking head, in particular for a high speed missile

Title (de)

Suchkopf, insbesondere für Hochgeschwindigkeits-Flugkörper

Title (fr)

Tête chercheuse, en particulier pour un missile à grande vitesse

Publication

EP 0994326 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118934 A

Priority

DE 19847218 A

Abstract (en)

The search head has a search device (14) mounted behind a window (12) that is transparent for the working radiation. The device responds to the working radiation from a target and produces target signals dependent on the position of the target in the field of view. There is an arrangement for determining a sighting line to the target and a cover (18) for protecting the window from thermal and mechanical loads, esp. for high speed flying craft. The cover has an opening and the sighting line can be tracked with this opening by a control arrangement.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Suchkopf mit einem Sucher (14), der hinter einem für eine Nutzstrahlung durchlässigen Fenster (12) angeordnet ist und auf die Nutzstrahlung eines Ziels anspricht und von der Lage des Ziels im Gesichtsfeld abhängige Zielsignale liefert, mit Mitteln zur Bestimmung einer Sichtlinie zu dem Ziel und mit einer Abdeckung (18) zum Schutz des Fensters (12) vor thermischen und mechanischen Belastungen, insbesondere für Hochgeschwindigkeits-Flugkörper, weist die Abdeckung (18) eine Öffnung (20) auf und ist mit dieser Öffnung (20) durch Stellmittel der Sichtlinie nachführbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 15/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 15/01 (2006.01); F42B 15/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 15/01 (2013.01); F42B 15/34 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994326 A2 20000419; EP 0994326 A3 20010711; EP 0994326 B1 20040512; DE 19847218 A1 20000420

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070925

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070925

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050912

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070925

2006-11-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061114

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060911

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060721

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050215

2005-02-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-10-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909457

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010615

2002-04-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 42B 15/01 A, 7F 42B 15/34 B

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI