Global Patent Index - EP 0994445 A2

EP 0994445 A2 2000-04-19 - Bank note deposit/withdrawal machine

Title (en)

Bank note deposit/withdrawal machine

Title (de)

Banknotenausgeber

Title (fr)

Machine de dépôt/retrait de billet de banque

Publication

EP 0994445 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99119958 A

Priority

JP 28906698 A

Abstract (en)

A bank note storage/supply box (8) includes a stack feed roller 801 driven for rotation, a pick-up roller 811, a gate roller 803 not rotating in a carrying-over direction, a brush roller 804 on the same axis as the gate roller 803 with its elastic material radiantly arranged, a separation/stack guide 805 movable in a separating operation and a stacking operation, an upper and lower bank note support unit, and a holding plate driven in the horizontal direction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 19/00 (2006.01); B65H 29/22 (2006.01); G07D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 83/025 (2013.01); B65H 29/22 (2013.01); G07D 11/0012 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42142 (2013.01); B65H 2404/561 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1912 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994445 A2 20000419; EP 0994445 A3 20010418; EP 0994445 B1 20080312; CN 1129874 C 20031203; CN 1258896 A 20000705; DE 69938327 D1 20080424; DE 69938327 T2 20090312; KR 100330326 B1 20020401; KR 20000028967 A 20000525

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141012

2015-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20141012

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69938327

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131009

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131009

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091013

2010-06-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20081215

2008-07-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2008-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69938327

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-04-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2008-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-07-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HITACHI-OMRON TERMINAL SOLUTIONS, CORP.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HITACHI-OMRON TERMINAL SOLUTIONS, CORP.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB SE

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010820

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 07D 1/00 A, 7G 07D 11/00 B, 7G 07D 13/00 B

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI