Global Patent Index - EP 0994445 A3

EP 0994445 A3 2001-04-18 - Bank note deposit/withdrawal machine

Title (en)

Bank note deposit/withdrawal machine

Title (de)

Banknotenausgeber

Title (fr)

Machine de dépôt/retrait de billet de banque

Publication

EP 0994445 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99119958 A

Priority

JP 28906698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0994445A2] A bank note storage/supply box (8) includes a stack feed roller 801 driven for rotation, a pick-up roller 811, a gate roller 803 not rotating in a carrying-over direction, a brush roller 804 on the same axis as the gate roller 803 with its elastic material radiantly arranged, a separation/stack guide 805 movable in a separating operation and a stacking operation, an upper and lower bank note support unit, and a holding plate driven in the horizontal direction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 1/00; G07D 11/00; G07D 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 19/00 (2006.01); B65H 29/22 (2006.01); G07D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 83/025 (2013.01); B65H 29/22 (2013.01); G07D 11/0012 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42142 (2013.01); B65H 2404/561 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1912 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994445 A2 20000419; EP 0994445 A3 20010418; EP 0994445 B1 20080312; CN 1129874 C 20031203; CN 1258896 A 20000705; DE 69938327 D1 20080424; DE 69938327 T2 20090312; KR 100330326 B1 20020401; KR 20000028967 A 20000525

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141012

2015-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141012

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69938327

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131009

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131009

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091013

2010-06-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081215

2008-07-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69938327 P 20080424

2008-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2008-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-07-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HITACHI-OMRON TERMINAL SOLUTIONS, CORP.

2006-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HITACHI-OMRON TERMINAL SOLUTIONS, CORP.

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB SE

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010820

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07D 1/00 A, 7G 07D 11/00 B, 7G 07D 13/00 B

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI