Global Patent Index - EP 0994448 A3

EP 0994448 A3 2000-12-13 - Method and device to select traffic information for a vehicle

Title (en)

Method and device to select traffic information for a vehicle

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Selektion von Verkehrsinformation für ein Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de sélection d'informations routières pour un véhicule

Publication

EP 0994448 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99119369 A

Priority

  • DE 19847849 A
  • US 41756599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0994448A2] The method involves performing the selection automatically and depending on a time-dependent motion profile for the vehicle. The selection can be performed depending on the speed of the vehicle (1) and additionally depending on direction changes. Information can be selected from a circular area of defined radius (R1) when the vehicle is started up. An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for selecting traffic information in motor vehicles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01C 21/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01C 21/00 (2006.01); G08G 1/09 (2006.01); G08G 1/0962 (2006.01); G08G 1/0969 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/096716 (2013.01); G08G 1/096741 (2013.01); G08G 1/09675 (2013.01); G08G 1/096775 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[XA] EP 0756153 A2 19970129 - AISIN AW CO [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994448 A2 20000419; EP 0994448 A3 20001213; EP 0994448 B1 20050831; DE 19847849 A1 20000427; JP 2000123291 A 20000428; JP 4391638 B2 20091224; US 6266608 B1 20010724

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160816

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY, FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59912490

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-10-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59912490

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BECKER, KURIG, STRAUS, DE

2015-10-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150910 AND 20150916

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110929

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100920

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-08-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-10-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050917

2005-10-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912490

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-10-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-08-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040302

2002-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 01C 21/34 A

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI