Global Patent Index - EP 0994495 A3

EP 0994495 A3 2001-04-18 - Electrical contact

Title (en)

Electrical contact

Title (de)

Elektrischer Kontakt

Title (fr)

Contact électrique

Publication

EP 0994495 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99114911 A

Priority

DE 19847519 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0994495A2] The electrical contact has a metallic contact part (1) acting as a contact piece and an electrically insulating part (2), having a bore (21) receiving a threaded contact shaft (12) of the contact part and provided on opposite sides with contoured surfaces matched to the surface of the contact part and the inside wall of an insulating oil vessel cylinder receiving the electrical contact. The contact shaft bore is surrounded by a groove (23) receiving an elastic seal (3) on the side of the insulating part facing the cylinder wall

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 29/04 (2006.01); H01H 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/0016 (2013.01); H01H 2009/0022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994495 A2 20000419; EP 0994495 A3 20010418; EP 0994495 B1 20051102; AT 308795 T 20051115; DE 19847519 C1 20000810; DE 59912732 D1 20051208; JP 2000150263 A 20000530

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100730

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100730

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59912732

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090723

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090528

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090703

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090709

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090727

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070730

2006-10-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060803

2006-07-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060703

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912732 P 20051208

2005-11-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051102

2005-11-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

2005-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: RO

2005-11-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: INSULATING CYLINDER WITH CONTACT FOR SELECTOR SWITCH

2005-04-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050216

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT SE

2002-01-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19990730

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 19990730;SI

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 19990730;SI