Global Patent Index - EP 0994525 A2

EP 0994525 A2 2000-04-19 - Antenna unit

Title (en)

Antenna unit

Title (de)

Antenneneinheit

Title (fr)

Unité d'antenne

Publication

EP 0994525 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118350 A

Priority

DE 29818430 U

Abstract (en)

The aerial unit (1) with at least one sender and/or receiver aerial (3-5) is characterized in that it includes a common carrier element (2) which independently of the vehicle bodywork supports the aerials attached to this element.

Abstract (de)

Für eine Antenneneinheit (1) mit zumindest einer Sende- und/oder Empfangsantenne (3;4;5), vorgesehen zum Einbau in Personenkraftfahrzeuge (9) unterhalb der Außenwandung (10) eines Karosseriebauteils (8), wird vorgesehen, daß die Antenneneinheit (1) ein gemeinsames Trägerteil (2) umfaßt, das die an diesem angeordneten Antenne(n) (3;4;5)unabhängig von der Fahrzeugkarosserie mechanisch abstützt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 21/28; H01Q 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/32 (2006.01); H01Q 21/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/3291 (2013.01); H01Q 21/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29818430 U1 19990512; EP 0994525 A2 20000419; EP 0994525 A3 20021002; US 6351242 B1 20020226

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-15 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20051208

2003-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030109

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI