Global Patent Index - EP 0994528 A2

EP 0994528 A2 2000-04-19 - Modular multi-terminal block for a solder free insulation displacement connection of insulated conductors

Title (en)

Modular multi-terminal block for a solder free insulation displacement connection of insulated conductors

Title (de)

Module Mehrfach-Anschlussleiste für lötfreie Schneid-Klemm-Andrahtung isolierter elektrischer Leiter

Title (fr)

Réglette de bornes modulaires pour la connexion autodénudante, sans soudure de conducteurs électriques isolés

Publication

EP 0994528 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118821 A

Priority

CH 205698 A

Abstract (en)

The terminal rail module has a plastics housing provided with a number of chambers for reception of knife clamp elements (4) for respective telephone line wires and having fixings (7) at its ends, for securing the terminal rail module to opposite sides of a wiring channel.

Abstract (de)

Die module Mehrfach-Anschlussleiste für eine lötfreie Schneid-Klemm-Andrahtung der elektrisch isolierten Adern von Amtsleitungen und Teilnehmerleitungen einer Telefonzentrale umfasst ein Gehäuse (1) aus Kunststoff, in dem sich eine Mehrzahl längsseitig modular beabstandete Beschaltungsmittel (4) zum Durchschalten der einander zugeordneten Leitungsadern befinden. Weiter umfasst das Gehäuse Mittel in Form von Klinken (7) zur umschlagsmässigen Montage der Leiste auf einem Montagekanal für eine freie Zugänglichkeit für die Aufschaltung der Adern der Amtsleitung oder der Adern der Teilnehmerleitung. Weiter sind die Beschaltungsmittel zum Durchschalten der einander zugeordneten Leitungsadern eine Mehrzahl von nebeneinander in der Anschlussleiste (1) angeordnete, sich von der Beschaltungsseite (2) für die Amtsleitungen zur Beschaltungsseite (3) für die Teilnehmerleitungen erstreckende, im wesentlichen flächige Beschaltungsklemmen (4) mit jeweils einem Schneidklemmschlitz (5, 5') an beiden Enden. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/24; H01R 4/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/26 (2006.01); H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 9/24 (2006.01); H01R 43/00 (2006.01); H04Q 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/2408 (2013.01); H01R 4/2433 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994528 A2 20000419; EP 0994528 A3 20000719; AU 5020099 A 20000420; CN 1250963 A 20000419; JP 2000175226 A 20000623; KR 20000034990 A 20000626; PL 335961 A1 20000425; TW 429725 B 20010411

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-10-08 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030718

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010119

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI