Global Patent Index - EP 0994530 A2

EP 0994530 A2 2000-04-19 - Electrical connector

Title (en)

Electrical connector

Title (de)

Elektrischer Steckverbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 0994530 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99203031 A

Priority

DE 19847369 A

Abstract (en)

An electrical connector (10) comprising a housing (12) having a first part (14) and a second part (16); and an electric contact (18); wherein the first part of the housing has a front face (20) and a rear face (22), a channel (24) formed in the front face and having an internal wall (28) remote from the front face and a side wall (30) with a shoulder (32) directed towards the front face and an angled surface (34) between the shoulder and the internal wall, and a through bore (26) extending between the rear face and the channel; wherein the second part of the housing has a front face (36), a rear face (38), and a through bore (40) extending between the front and rear faces and having a resilient latch tang (44) within the bore directed towards the front face with a lip (46) directed towards the front face; wherein the second part is positioned in the channel in the first part and is movable between an initial assembly position in which the rear face of the second part engages the shoulder in the channel and the bores are substantially aligned, and a fully assembled position in which the rear face of the second part engages the internal wall of the channel and the bores are out of alignment, the rear face of the second part engaging the angled surface during movement from the initial assembly position to the fully assembled position; and wherein the electric contact has a first rearwardly directed shoulder (50) and a second rearwardly directed shoulder (52), the contact being positioned in the bores with the first shoulder engaging the lip on the latch tang and the second shoulder engaging the internal wall of the channel when the second part of the housing is in the fully assembled position. Provides a double lock for the contact without the need for additional parts. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/436; H01R 13/424

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/436 (2006.01); H01R 13/422 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/4364 (2013.01); H01R 13/4223 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994530 A2 20000419; EP 0994530 A3 20020529; EP 0994530 B1 20060111; BR 9904953 A 20000829; BR 9904953 B1 20140415; DE 19847369 A1 20000420; DE 69929393 D1 20060406

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150929

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060917

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060917

2007-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20061012

2006-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-04-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060422

2006-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69929393

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-04-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040924

2003-02-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI