Global Patent Index - EP 0994586 A1

EP 0994586 A1 2000-04-19 - Method and data frame structure for the digital transmission of information with quasi-seamless switch to an alternative frequency

Title (en)

Method and data frame structure for the digital transmission of information with quasi-seamless switch to an alternative frequency

Title (de)

Verfahren und Datenrahmenstruktur zur digitalen Nachrichtenübertragung mit quasi-nahtlosen Umshalten auf alternative Frequenzen

Title (fr)

Méthode et structure de trame de données pour la transmission numérique d'information avec passage quasi-transparent à une fréquence alternative

Publication

EP 0994586 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98119400 A

Priority

EP 98119400 A

Abstract (en)

For a digital transmission information system, in particular broadcast systems that deliver the same services in adjacent areas on different frequencies like DAB, video and data transmission in LF-, MF- or HF ranges, the invention proposes criterias to switch to alternative frequencies without loosing the service (seamless switch). The transmission system is defined such that the receiver is able to test the alternative frequencies without loosing any relevant information on the current tuned frequency. The signal in the air consists of two parts, i.e. a continuous data-channel (SDC) like audio with interleaving in time but not repeated, and a static data-channel (SDC) including information about the service, multiplex configuration, program type, transmitter ID, service ID and alternative frequency list. During the static data-channel, the receiver has the time to check alternative frequencies without losing relevant information data. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/26 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994586 A1 20000419; EP 0994586 B1 20070606; DE 69837881 D1 20070719; DE 69837881 T2 20080228

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151102

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151014

2016-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151014

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69837881

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-16 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 69837881

- Effective date: 20120614

2012-07-11 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20120618

2008-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080307

2007-11-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69837881 P 20070719

2007-06-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SONY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2007-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-06-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZUMKELLER, MARKUS,C/O SONY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2007-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHAEFER, WOLFGANG,C/O SONY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2005-09-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SONY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000926

2000-05-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SONY INTERNATIONAL (EUROPE) GMBH

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI