Global patent index - EP 0994587 A2

EP 0994587 A2 2000-04-19 - Method for selecting a broadcast programme from a secondary memory of a broadcast receiver, which is capable of receiving Radio Data System (RDS) signals

Title (en)

Method for selecting a broadcast programme from a secondary memory of a broadcast receiver, which is capable of receiving Radio Data System (RDS) signals

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Auswahl eines Rundfunkprogramms aus einem Hintergrundspeicher eines zum Empfang von Radio-Daten geeigneten Rundfunkempfängers

Title (fr)

Méthode pour sélectionner un programme de radiodiffusion dans une mémoire supplémentaire d'un récepteur, capable de capter des signaux RDS

Publication

EP 0994587 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114652 A

Priority

DE 19847018 A

Abstract (en)

The program selection method responds to the reception quality of the received radio broadcast program, to select at least one radio broadcast program from the background memory of the radio data system radio receiver, which has a program identification which differs from that of the first radio broadcast program only in its regional area identification. The reception quality of each selected radio broadcast program is evaluated and the tuner is switched to the radio broadcast program with the best reception quality.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Auswahl eines Rundfunkprogramms aus in einem Hintergrundspeicher eines RDS-(Radio-Daten-System)-Rundfunkempfängers abgespeicherten Rundfunkprogrammen mit unterschiedlichen Programmidentifikations-Codes (PI-Codes), wobei der PI-Code zumindest eine Länderkennung, eine Regionalkennung und eine Programmkennung umfasst. Hierbei werden in einem vorbestimmten Betriebszustand des RDS-Rundfunkempfängers in Abhängigkeit von einer Empfangsqualität eines momentan am RDS-Rundfunkempfänger eingestellten ersten Rundfunkprogramms bei der Auswahl eines neu am RDS-Rundfunkempfängers einzustellenden Rundfunkprogrammes aus dem Hintergrundspeicher ein oder mehrere im Hintergrundspeicher dem ersten Rundfunkprogramm nachfolgend gespeicherte zweite Rundfunkprogramme, welche sich vom ersten Rundfunkprogramm im PI-Code nur durch die Regionalkennung unterscheiden, entweder übersprungen oder einer Empfangsqualitätsprüfung unterzogen und es wird dasjenige zweite Rundfunkprogramm am RDS-Rundfunkempfänger eingestellt, welches die beste Empfangsqualität aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/26 (2008.01); H04H 60/37 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/22 (2013.01); H04H 60/37 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994587 A2 20000419; EP 0994587 A3 20040317; DE 19847018 A1 20000420

INPADOC legal status

2009-02-18 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20081020

2005-07-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050609

2004-12-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040917

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI