Global Patent Index - EP 0994588 A2

EP 0994588 A2 2000-04-19 - Broadcast receiver, which is capable of receiving Radio Data System (RDS) signals, comprising a means for demodulating a multiplexsignal

Title (en)

Broadcast receiver, which is capable of receiving Radio Data System (RDS) signals, comprising a means for demodulating a multiplexsignal

Title (de)

Vorrichtung in einem zum Empfang von Radio-Daten geeigneten Rundfunkempfänger für die Demodulation eines Multiplexsignals

Title (fr)

Récepteur de radiodiffusion, capable de capter des données RDS, comportant un dispositif pour la démodulation d'un signal multiplex

Publication

EP 0994588 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114653 A

Priority

DE 19847019 A

Abstract (en)

The multiplex demodulator (100) has an input bandpass filter (10) for filtering out the radio-data-system signal and a traffic radio signal. A first demodulation path (12) is used for selecting radio-data-system information from the radio-data-system signal and a second parallel demodulation path (30) containing a clock recovery device (26) and/or a synchronisation device, is used for generating a system clock from the radio-data-system signal and maintaining the system clock in the absence of the latter.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft einen Demodulator (100) für ein Multiplexsignal (MPX-Signal) eines RDS-(Radio-Daten-System)-Rundfunkempfängers, welches zumindest ein Stereosignal, ein Radio-Daten-System-Signal (RDS-Signal) und ggf. ein analoges Verkehrsfunk-Signal (VF-Signal) enthält, wobei der Demodulator (100) zum Abtrennen des Stereosignals und Herausfiltern des RDS-Signals und des VF-Signals ein Eingangsbandpassfilter (10) aufweist, welchem ein erster Demodulationspfad (12) zum Selektieren von RDS-Daten aus dem RDS-Signal nachgeordnet ist. Hierbei ist ein zweiter Demodulationspfad (30) vorgesehen, welcher dem ersten Demodulationspfad (12) derart parallel geschaltet ist, dass wahlweise der erste oder zweite Demodulationspfad (12,30) mit dem Eingangsbandpassfilter (10) verbindbar ist, wobei der zweite Demodulationspfad (30) wie der erste eine Taktrückgewinnungseinrichtung (26) umfasst, welche aus den RDS-Daten einen Systemtakt erzeugt und auch ohne RDS-Signal den Systemtakt über eine vorbestimmte Zeitspanne aufrecht erhält. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/26 (2008.01); H04H 40/18 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 40/18 (2013.01); H04H 20/22 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994588 A2 20000419; EP 0994588 A3 20040428; DE 19847019 A1 20000420

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-28 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: R079

- Free Format Text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H04H0001000000

- IPC: H04H0040000000

- Effective date: 20140723

2014-07-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-07-23 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: R079

- Free Format Text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H04H0001000000

- IPC: H04H0040000000

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-07-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20041028

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI