Global Patent Index - EP 0994589 A2

EP 0994589 A2 2000-04-19 - Receiver for receiving Digital Audio Broadcast (DAB) programmes

Title (en)

Receiver for receiving Digital Audio Broadcast (DAB) programmes

Title (de)

Empfänger für den Empfang von digitalen Hörfunkprogrammen (DAB)

Title (fr)

Récepteur pour la réception de programmes de radiodiffusion numérique DAB

Publication

EP 0994589 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114655 A

Priority

DE 19846865 A

Abstract (en)

The receiver has a memory in which characteristics of each ensemble, or set of adjacent orthogonal bearers, received is entered in a table. The receiver is set up by calling up an entry from the table during a control process and setting up the receiver to receive the associated ensemble.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Empfänger für digitalen Hörfunk (DAB) werden Merkmale von jeweils empfangenen Ensembles in eine in einem Speicher abgelegte Tabelle eingetragen. Durch einen Bedienvorgang wird ein Eintrag aus der Tabelle abgerufen und der Empfänger auf Empfang des zugehörigen Ensembles eingestellt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/16 (2006.01); H04H 60/43 (2008.01); H03J 1/00 (2006.01); H04B 1/06 (2006.01); H04H 60/41 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/41 (2013.01); H04H 40/00 (2013.01); H04H 2201/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19846865 A1 20000413; DE 59914854 D1 20081009; EP 0994589 A2 20000419; EP 0994589 A3 20030521; EP 0994589 B1 20080827; JP 2000124821 A 20000428

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130727

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130727

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090528

2008-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914854 P 20081009

2008-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04H 60/43 20080101AFI20080319BHEP

2008-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04B 1/06 20060101ALI20080319BHEP

2008-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04B 1/16 20060101ALI20080319BHEP

2008-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H03J 1/00 20060101ALI20080319BHEP

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041129

2005-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041129

2004-02-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031121

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04H 1/00 A

2003-05-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04B 1/06 B

2003-05-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04B 1/16 B

2003-05-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 03J 1/00 B

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI