Global Patent Index - EP 0994596 A2

EP 0994596 A2 2000-04-19 - Digital data bi-directional communication method and apparatus

Title (en)

Digital data bi-directional communication method and apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren und System zur bidirektionalen digitalen Datenübertragung

Title (fr)

Procédé et système de transmission bidirectionnelle de données numériques

Publication

EP 0994596 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99120271 A

Priority

IL 12654098 A

Abstract (en)

Apparatus and a method of bi-directional communication of digital data between a plurality of remote users and a base station using a shared communication channel and a time-division protocol in which the communication time is divided into a plurality of time slots is provided. The method includes transmitting packets of data according to a TDMA (Time Division Multiple Access) protocol in which each user is allocated a dedicated time slot in the shared communication channel; and transmitting other packets of data according to a time-division ALOHA protocol in which each user is allocated a time slot in the shared communication channel on an "as needed" basis, competing with other users for access to the shared communication channel, and subsequently re-transmits those packets of data where no acknowledgement is received until an acknowledgement is received. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 1/18; H04B 7/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 1/1887 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994596 A2 20000419; EP 0994596 A3 20011010; AU 5359199 A 20000413; IL 126540 D0 19990817

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020219

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI