Global Patent Index - EP 0994606 A2

EP 0994606 A2 2000-04-19 - Method of generating IEEE 1394 virtual network and controller thereof

Title (en)

Method of generating IEEE 1394 virtual network and controller thereof

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines IEEE 1394 virtuellen Netzes und dessen Steurungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la création d'un réseau virtuel IEEE 1394 et son controleur

Publication

EP 0994606 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99306920 A

Priority

KR 19980042716 A

Abstract (en)

A method of generating an IEEE 1394 virtual network in which a virtual network is constructed on the IEEE 1394 network and the respective nodes sense the virtual network. The method includes the steps of connecting a virtual network controller for generating a virtual self ID packet including a virtual node ID information required for constructing a virtual network to a predetermined IEEE 1394 network, the respective nodes and the virtual network controller constructing the IEEE 1394 network for determining whether the respective nodes are branches or leaves by performing virtual bus initialization, determining parent ports and child ports with respect to the ports of the respective nodes and a root node by performing a virtual tree identification, and determining the physical node IDs of the respective nodes by sending the prepared virtual self ID packet. A controller for generating the virtual network is also provided. According to the present invention, it is possible to arbitrarily set a node ID on a network. It is also possible to physically sense and operate a virtual network. When different (independently initialised) IEEE 1394 networks are connected by a certain medium, the respective nodes sense that the IEEE 1394 networks are in the same virtual network. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 12/46; H04L 12/40; H04L 12/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/701 (2013.01); H04L 12/28 (2006.01); H04L 12/40 (2006.01); H04L 12/46 (2006.01); H04L 12/70 (2013.01); H04L 12/751 (2013.01); H04L 12/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/40078 (2013.01); H04L 12/40071 (2013.01); H04L 12/4641 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994606 A2 20000419; EP 0994606 A3 20031015; EP 0994606 B1 20050511; CN 1135797 C 20040121; CN 1261232 A 20000726; DE 69925219 D1 20050616; DE 69925219 T2 20060119; JP 2000134264 A 20000512; JP 3262767 B2 20020304; KR 100272108 B1 20001115; KR 20000025575 A 20000506; US 6519634 B1 20030211

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2016-01-29 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20100413

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-07-30 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20100413

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-03-31 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20100301

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080903

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080818

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080912

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080803

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20061122

2008-01-31 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20061122

2006-12-29 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

- Ref Legal Event Code: FC

2006-11-17 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RN

2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-05-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060214

2006-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-06-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69925219

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-06-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2005-05-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-07-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031219

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 04L 12/46 A

2003-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 04L 12/40 B

2003-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 04L 12/64 B

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990914

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI