Global patent index - EP 0994638 A1

EP 0994638 A1 2000-04-19 - Charged-particle beam ejection method and apparatus using the method

Title (en)

Charged-particle beam ejection method and apparatus using the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Ejektion eines Ladungsträgerstrahls und Vorrichtung dazu

Title (fr)

Procédé d'éjection d'un faisceau de particules chargées et dispositif d'utilisation de ce procédé

Publication

EP 0994638 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99120001 A

Priority

JP 29490098 A

Abstract (en)

The strength of the high-frequency electromagnetic field generated by a high-frequency electromagnetic field applying unit 11 is controlled based on the energy of a charged-particle beam to be ejected from a synchrotron 1, by applying the high-frequency electromagnetic field to the charged-particle beam revolving in the synchrotron 1. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05H 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05H 13/04 (2006.01); H05H 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05H 7/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0673187 A1 19950920 - HITACHI LTD [JP]
  • [A] US 5363008 A 19941108 - HIRAMOTO KAZUO [JP], et al
  • [A] US 5668371 A 19970916 - DEASY JOSEPH O [US], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 08 29 August 1997 (1997-08-29)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 09 30 September 1997 (1997-09-30)
  • [A] MUTOH M: "Development of high-duty beam channel for tagged photons at the 1.3-GeV Tokyo Electron Synchrotron", JOURNAL OF SCIENCE OF THE HIROSHIMA UNIVERSITY, SERIES A (PHYSICS AND CHEMISTRY), AUG. 1987, JAPAN, vol. 51, no. 2, pages 187 - 219, XP000874135, ISSN: 0386-3034

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0994638 A1 20000419; JP 2000124000 A 20000428; JP 3864581 B2 20070110

INPADOC legal status

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030203

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE LI

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000811

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI