Global Patent Index - EP 0994753 A1

EP 0994753 A1 2000-04-26 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR A LABORATORY CENTRIFUGE

Title (en)

CONTROL DEVICE FOR A LABORATORY CENTRIFUGE

Title (de)

STEUERUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE LABORZENTRIFUGE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR CENTRIFUGEUSE DE LABORATOIRE

Publication

EP 0994753 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97919042 A

Priority

  • DE 29712121 U
  • EP 9704855 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9902270A1] The invention relates to a control device designed to simplify the use of a laboratory centrifuge, especially as regards the correct entering of data specific to the rotor, receptacle and substance mixture into the corresponding memory unit. The control panel (7) has a control switch (10) positioned below a display panel (9) configured for the visual display of at least part of the current operating parameters of the laboratory centrifuge, which control switch serves to set all operating parameters and control functions of the centrifuge. The control switch (10) is configured for at least two independent switching movements, notably a rotating movement about its axis and a sliding movement in the direction of said axis, whereby these two switching movements make it possible to operate a menu configuration showing the operating parameters and control functions relating to the operation of the centrifuge. The selection and modification of operating parameters and control functions are assigned to one switching movement and the confirmation of these selections and corresponding modifications is assigned to the other switching movement. The result is a control device which is easy and reliable to use and which in connection with a corresponding menu guide provides users with explanations about its functions and, in particular, immediately informs them about the success or failure of a switching function initiated via the control switch (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B04B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04B 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04B 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9902270A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29712121 U1 19970911; EP 0994753 A1 20000426; EP 0994753 B1 20020220; JP 2000512212 A 20000919; US 6879262 B1 20050412; WO 9902270 A1 19990121

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170906

2017-09-27 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170906

2017-09-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59706465

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160714

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59706465

2014-10-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59706465

- Representative's name: REHBERG HUEPPE + PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE PARTG , DE

2012-07-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59706465

2012-07-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59706465

- Representative's name: REHBERG HUEPPE + PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE PARTG , DE

2003-02-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021121

2002-06-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59706465 20020328

2002-03-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020220

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010613

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991027

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB