Global Patent Index - EP 0994766 A1

EP 0994766 A1 2000-04-26 - STOP DEVICE FOR MITRE-BOX SAW

Title (en)

STOP DEVICE FOR MITRE-BOX SAW

Title (de)

ANSCHLAGVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE GEHRUNGSSÄGE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE BUTEE POUR SCIE A ONGLET

Publication

EP 0994766 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98939617 A

Priority

  • DE 19729552 A
  • EP 9804147 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19729552A1] The invention relates to a stop device for a mitre-box saw, as well as to a mitre-box saw provided with such a device. The invention seeks to provide a stop device or a mitre-box saw which is safe and easy to use, provides accurate crosscutting and is small and easy to make. To achieve this goal, the stop device comprises two stop means (103, 105, 104, 106) which rotate in a plane formed by a support (101), a bisecting line of the angle formed by the stop means (103, 104, 105, 106) remaining fixed relative to the support (101), whereby the stop means (103, 104, 105, 106) can rotate around a common axis (113).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27G 5/02; B27B 27/06; B27B 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27B 27/06 (2006.01); B27B 27/08 (2006.01); B27B 27/10 (2006.01); B27G 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27G 5/023 (2013.01); B27B 27/06 (2013.01); B27B 27/08 (2013.01); B27B 27/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9902317A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19729552 A1 19990114; AT 203195 T 20010815; EP 0994766 A1 20000426; EP 0994766 B1 20010718; WO 9902317 A1 19990121

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180201

2018-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59801049

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FESTO TOOLTECHNIC G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020704

2002-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801049 20010823

2001-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

2001-07-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-07-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-07-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 203195 T 20010815

2000-12-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FESTO TOOLTECHNIC GMBH & CO.

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991125

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL