Global Patent Index - EP 0994779 A1

EP 0994779 A1 2000-04-26 - INK DELIVERY SYSTEM ADAPTER

Title (en)

INK DELIVERY SYSTEM ADAPTER

Title (de)

ADAPTER FÜR TINTENZUFÜHRSYSTEM

Title (fr)

ADAPTATEUR DE SYSTEME D'ALIMENTATION EN ENCRE

Publication

EP 0994779 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98922083 A

Priority

  • US 9808887 W
  • US 87156697 A
  • US 3487498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9855318A1] A large variety of ink delivery systems for an existing ink-jet printing system are provided. The ink delivery systems include ink reservoirs of varying configuration and size which are capable of accommodating a variety of ink use rates. Each ink delivery system also has an electrical connector and an information storage device which are suitable for the various ink use rates. The information storage device may be a memory device circuit that provides enabling information to the printing system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17556 (2013.01); B41J 2/17503 (2013.01); B41J 2/17509 (2013.01); B41J 2/17513 (2013.01); B41J 2/17523 (2013.01); B41J 2/17553 (2013.01); B41J 2/17566 (2013.01); B41J 2002/17573 (2013.01); B41J 2002/17576 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855318A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9855318 A1 19981210; CN 1112994 C 20030702; CN 1259086 A 20000705; DE 69812950 D1 20030508; DE 69812950 T2 20031211; DE 69833054 D1 20060202; DE 69833054 T2 20060907; DE 69833983 D1 20060518; DE 69833983 T2 20061123; DE 69834142 D1 20060518; DE 69834142 T2 20061228; DE 69834143 D1 20060518; DE 69834143 T2 20061221; EP 0994779 A1 20000426; EP 0994779 B1 20030402; EP 1219448 A2 20020703; EP 1219448 A3 20021016; EP 1219448 B1 20060405; EP 1275512 A1 20030115; EP 1287997 A1 20030305; EP 1287997 B1 20060405; EP 1287998 A1 20030305; EP 1287998 B1 20060329; EP 1293347 A2 20030319; EP 1293347 A3 20030604; EP 1293347 B1 20051228; ES 2191304 T3 20030901; ES 2251562 T3 20060501; ES 2257504 T3 20060801; ES 2257507 T3 20060801; ES 2257508 T3 20060801; JP 2002513340 A 20020508; JP 4088353 B2 20080521

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140512

2015-06-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150629

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140511

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69812950

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140511

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69812950

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130423

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130424

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120528

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-09-21 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P.

- Effective date: 20120911

2012-04-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120329 AND 20120404

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040105

2003-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2191304 T3

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69812950 P 20030508

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB

2003-04-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

2000-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991209

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB