Global Patent Index - EP 0994803 A1

EP 0994803 A1 2000-04-26 - DOUBLE POINT MOORING SYSTEM

Title (en)

DOUBLE POINT MOORING SYSTEM

Title (de)

ZWEIPUNKTVERANKERUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'AMARRAGE FUNICULAIRE

Publication

EP 0994803 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98930457 A

Priority

  • US 9812961 W
  • US 5195997 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9902394A1] A spread mooring arrangement is provided for use in deep water (greater than 200 meters) when it is advantageous to maximize the clearance between shuttle tankers (20) used for product off loading and the anchor legs associated with a spread mooring of the permanently moored tanker (10). Mooring insert tubes are provided at the bow and stern of the vessel. Bow mooring lines (30) extend from the sea floor through an opening of the bottom of the hull of the vessel and via a bow mooring insert tube (100) for securement on a chain pull-up deck (15). Stern mooring lines (40) extend from the sea floor through an opening in the bottom of the hull of the vessel and via a stern mooring insert tube (120) for securement on a chain pull-up deck (15). Space is available on one side of the vessel for a porch (65) for securement of production risers (70), work over risers and control umbilicals, thereby providing flexibility of the use of the vessel for the circumstance where production methods for the oil field change during its leftime or where other fields need to be coupled to the vessel with risers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 21/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 21/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 21/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DK GB MC NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9902394 A1 19990121; AU 7984698 A 19990208; BR 9810562 A 20000815; CA 2293328 A1 19990121; CN 1261311 A 20000726; EP 0994803 A1 20000426; EP 0994803 A4 20020807; EP 0994803 B1 20030813; OA 11308 A 20031024

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050624

2006-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060101

2006-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060101

2005-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050624

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-06-01 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20040601

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-10 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040510

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040505

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DK GB MC NL

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FMC TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020712

2002-08-07 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020625

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DK GB MC NL

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991122

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DK GB MC NL