Global patent index - EP 0994821 A2

EP 0994821 A2 2000-04-26 - WINDING MACHINE

Title (en)

WINDING MACHINE

Title (de)

AUFSPULMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE DE BOBINAGE

Publication

EP 0994821 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98941290 A

Priority

  • DE 19729536 A
  • EP 9804156 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9902440A2] The invention relates to a winding machine to wind a continuously fed thread on a spool; wherein the thread is guided into a cross-winding device consisting of a pre-cross-winding unit and a grooved roller located downstream from the path of the thread. The winding machine has a thread deflection device in order to change the thread from a full spool clamped on a spool spindle to an empty spool clamped on another spool spindle by rotating a winding turret. The thread deflection device consists of a guide plate which is guided parallel to the periphery of the grooved roller and a thread guide which can be positioned parallel to the axis of the spool spindle. By pivoting the guide plate, the thread can be thus guided from the cross-winding device without substantially changing the winding.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 65/00 (2006.01); B65H 67/048 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 65/00 (2013.01); B65H 67/048 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9902440A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9902440 A2 19990121; WO 9902440 A3 19990401; CN 1100715 C 20030205; CN 1259103 A 20000705; EP 0994821 A2 20000426; EP 0994821 B1 20020612; TR 200000169 T2 20000721; TW 503270 B 20020921

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090706

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-02-26 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080728

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080730

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030313

2002-11-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804436

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-18

2002-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010529

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000114

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI