Global Patent Index - EP 0994886 A1

EP 0994886 A1 2000-04-26 - METALLOCENES, LIGANDS AND OLEFIN POLYMERIZATION

Title (en)

METALLOCENES, LIGANDS AND OLEFIN POLYMERIZATION

Title (de)

METALLOCENE, LIGANDE UND OLEFINPOLYMERISATION

Title (fr)

COMPOSES ORGANOMETALLIQUES, LIGANDS ET POLYMERISATION D'OLEFINES

Publication

EP 0994886 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99924944 A

Priority

  • EP 99924944 A
  • EP 9903247 W
  • EP 98201501 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958539A1] A class of metallocene compounds is disclosed having the following general formula (I): Rn(Cp)(A)MLp wherein Rn is a structural bridge; Cp is a heterocyclic cyclopentadienyl group of formula (II) wherein R<1> and R<2> are hydrogen or hydrocarbon groups; M is a transition metal of group 3, 4, 5 or 6 or to the lanthanides or the actinides in the Periodic Table or the Elements (new IUPAC version); L is a monoanionic ligand; Z is NR<3> or O; X and Y are selected from (CR<4>2)n, BR<4>2, PR<4>, SiR<4>2 or GeR<4>2; and substituents R<4> are hydrogen atoms or hydrocarbon radicals, with the proviso that both X and Y cannot be carbon atoms at the same time; A is a group selected from substituted or unsubstituted cyclopentadienyls, which may carry one or more condensed cycles, =NR<5>, -O-, -S- and =PR<5> groups, R<5> being defined as substituents R<1> and R<2>, and groups corresponding to formula (II); p is an integer from 0 to 3. These metallocene compounds are useful as catalyst components for the polymerization of olefins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07F 17/00; C07F 5/02; C07F 7/08; C07F 7/30; C07F 9/6541; C08F 10/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07F 7/10 (2006.01); C07F 5/02 (2006.01); C07F 7/00 (2006.01); C07F 7/08 (2006.01); C07F 7/30 (2006.01); C07F 9/6518 (2006.01); C07F 9/6541 (2006.01); C07F 9/6596 (2006.01); C07F 17/00 (2006.01); C07F 19/00 (2006.01); C08F 4/62 (2006.01); C08F 10/00 (2006.01); C08F 10/02 (2006.01); C08F 4/659 (2006.01); C08F 4/6592 (2006.01); C08F 110/02 (2006.01); C08F 210/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07F 17/00 (2013.01); C07F 5/027 (2013.01); C07F 7/0816 (2013.01); C07F 7/30 (2013.01); C07F 9/6596 (2013.01); C08F 10/02 (2013.01); C08F 4/65908 (2013.01); C08F 4/65912 (2013.01); C08F 4/65925 (2013.01); C08F 110/02 (2013.01); C08F 210/16 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08F 10/02 + C08F 4/65927
  2. C08F 110/02 + C08F 2500/17
  3. C08F 210/16 + C08F 210/14 + C08F 2500/17 + C08F 2500/20

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958539A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958539 A1 19991118; AU 4141999 A 19991129; CA 2294608 A1 19991118; CN 1268951 A 20001004; EP 0994886 A1 20000426; JP 2002513428 A 20020508; KR 20010021604 A 20010315

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020222

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL TECHNOLOGY COMPANY B.V.

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL