Global Patent Index - EP 0994895 A1

EP 0994895 A1 2000-04-26 - DIPEPTIDE COMPOUNDS WHICH INHIBIT LEUKOCYTE ADHESION MEDIATED BY VLA-4

Title (en)

DIPEPTIDE COMPOUNDS WHICH INHIBIT LEUKOCYTE ADHESION MEDIATED BY VLA-4

Title (de)

DIPEPTIDE, DIE DIE VLA-4 VERMITTELTE ADHÄSION VON LEUKOZYTEN INHIBIEREN

Title (fr)

COMPOSES DE DIPEPTIDES INHIBANT UNE ADHESION DE LEUCOCYTES REGULEE PAR VLA-4

Publication

EP 0994895 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98937991 A

Priority

  • US 9815314 W
  • US 90441597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9906435A1] Diclosed are compounds which bind VLA-4. Certain of these compounds also inhibit leukocyte adhesion and, in particular, leukocyte adhesion mediated by VLA-4. Such compounds are useful in the treatment of inflammatory diseases in a mammalian patient, e.g., human, such as asthma, Alzheimer's disease, atherosclerosis, AIDS dementia, diabetes, inflammatory bowel disease, rheumatoid arthristis, tissue transplantation, tumor metastasis and myocardial ischemia. The compounds can also be administered for the treatment of inflammatory brain diseases such as multiple sclerosis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 5/078; A61K 38/05; C07K 5/062; C07K 5/065

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 5/06 (2006.01); C07K 5/062 (2006.01); C07K 5/065 (2006.01); C07K 5/078 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 5/06026 (2013.01); C07K 5/06078 (2013.01); C07K 5/06165 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906435A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9906435 A1 19990211; AR 016387 A1 20010704; AU 8661298 A 19990222; BR 9811599 A 20000919; CA 2291475 A1 19990211; CN 1265673 A 20000906; EP 0994895 A1 20000426; HU 0002682 A2 20010730; HU 0002682 A3 20011228; IL 133642 D0 20010430; JP 2001512137 A 20010821; KR 20010022412 A 20010315; NO 20000412 A 20000324; NO 20000412 D0 20000127; PL 338554 A1 20001106; ZA 9806834 B 20000502

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080201

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: THORSETT, EUGENE, D.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SEMKO, CHRISTOPHER, M.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PLEISS, MICHAEL, A.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KONRADI, ANDREI, W.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GRANT, FRANCINE, S.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DRESSEN, DARREN, B.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAUDY, REINHARDT, BERNHARD

2007-03-09 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1025976

2007-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070118

2002-12-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ELAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

2002-12-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WYETH

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: THORSETT, EUGENE, D.

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SEMKO, CHRISTOPHER, M.

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PLEISS, MICHAEL, A.

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KONRADI, ANDREI, W.

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GRANT, FRANCINE, S.

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DRESSEN, DARREN, B.

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAUDY, REINHARDT, BERNHARD

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000225

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000225;LT PAYMENT 20000225;LV PAYMENT 20000225;MK PAYMENT 20000225;RO PAYMENT 20000225;SI PAYMENT 20000225