Global Patent Index - EP 0994929 A4

EP 0994929 A4 2001-02-21 - AZEOTROPE AND AZEOTROPE-LIKE COMPOSITIONS OF 1-BROMOPROPANE AND HIGHLY FLUORINATED HYDROCARBONS

Title (en)

AZEOTROPE AND AZEOTROPE-LIKE COMPOSITIONS OF 1-BROMOPROPANE AND HIGHLY FLUORINATED HYDROCARBONS

Title (de)

AZEOTROPE SOWIE AZEOTROPÄHNLICHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS 1-BROMPROPAN UNDHOCHFLUORIERTEN KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS AZEOTROPES, ET DU TYPE AZEOTROPE, DE 1-BROMOPROPANE ET D'HYDROCARBURES A HAUTE TENEUR EN FLUOR

Publication

EP 0994929 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98933297 A

Priority

  • US 9814252 W
  • US 5205897 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9902616A1] This invention provides a solvent composition comprising 1-bromopropane and a decafluoropentane for use as a cleaning and degreasing solvent. Preferably the decafluoropentane consists essentially of 1,1,1,2,3,4,4,5,5,5-decafluoropentane. The solvent composition optionally includes stabilizers and co-solvents such as alcohols, ketones, ethers, acetals, nitroalkanes, epoxides and amines. Specific compositions of 1-bromopropane, 1,1,1,2,3,4,4,5,5,5-decafluoropentane and optional stabilizers provide azeotrope compositions that are particularly well suited as cleaning and degreasing solvents.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09D 9/00; C11D 7/50; C23G 5/02; C23G 5/028

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 7/30 (2006.01); C11D 7/50 (2006.01); C23G 5/02 (2006.01); C23G 5/028 (2006.01); C11D 7/26 (2006.01); C11D 7/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 7/261 (2013.01); C11D 7/505 (2013.01); C11D 7/5081 (2013.01); C23G 5/02825 (2013.01); C11D 7/263 (2013.01); C11D 7/264 (2013.01); C11D 7/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [AY] DE 19614355 A1 19961031 - TOSOH CORP [JP]
  • [AY] US 5064559 A 19911112 - MERCHANT ABID N [US], et al
  • [AY] US 5064560 A 19911112 - MERCHANT ABID N [US]
  • [E] WO 9935210 A1 19990715 - DU PONT [US], et al
  • [AY] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199143, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class E16, AN 1991-313393, XP002156059
  • [AY] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199325, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A60, AN 1993-200458, XP002156060
  • See also references of WO 9902616A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9902616 A1 19990121; AU 8297398 A 19990208; CA 2296589 A1 19990121; CA 2296589 C 20071016; DE 69826473 D1 20041028; DE 69826473 T2 20060223; EP 0994929 A1 20000426; EP 0994929 A4 20010221; EP 0994929 B1 20040922; JP 2001509533 A 20010724

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130709

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-04-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69826473

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130709

2014-02-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GREAT LAKES CHEMICAL CORP.

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120713

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120724

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120731

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120712

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120625

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-08-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69826473 P 20041028

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030516

2001-02-21 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010105

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2001-02-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 09D 9/00 A, 7C 11D 7/50 B, 7C 23G 5/02 B, 7C 23G 5/028 B

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000201

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL