Global Patent Index - EP 0994946 A1

EP 0994946 A1 2000-04-26 - CODING SEQUENCE HAPLOTYPES OF THE HUMAN BRCA2 GENE

Title (en)

CODING SEQUENCE HAPLOTYPES OF THE HUMAN BRCA2 GENE

Title (de)

MENSCHLICHE BRCA2 GEN KODIERENDE SEQUENZ HAPLOTYPEN

Title (fr)

HAPLOTYPES D'UNE SEQUENCE CODANTE DU GENE HUMAIN BRCA2

Publication

EP 0994946 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98945756 A

Priority

  • US 9816905 W
  • US 5578497 P
  • US 6492697 P
  • US 6536797 P
  • US 7171598 A
  • US 8447198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9909164A1] Five DNA and protein sequences have been determined for the BRCA2 gene, as have been ten polymorphic sites and their rates of occurrence in the normal alleles of BRCA2. The sequences BRCA2<(omi1-5)> and the ten polymorphic sites will provide accuracy and reliability for genetic testing. One skilled in the art will be able to avoid misinterpretations of changes in the gene and/or protein sequence, determine the presence of a normal sequence, and of mutations of BRCA2. This invention is also related to a method of performing gene therapy with BRCA2<(omi1-5)> coding sequences or fragments thereof. This invention is further related to protein therapy with BRCA2<(omi1-5)> proteins or their functional equivalents.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A61K 38/17; A61K 48/00; C07K 14/47; C07K 16/18; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6806 (2013.01); C07K 14/4703 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6886 (2013.01); C12Q 2539/105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9909164A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9909164 A1 19990225; WO 9909164 A9 19990506; AU 9292898 A 19990308; EP 0994946 A1 20000426; EP 2275574 A2 20110119; EP 2275574 A3 20120627; EP 2275574 B1 20150603; EP 2275575 A2 20110119; EP 2275575 A3 20120711; IL 134505 D0 20010430; JP 2001514887 A 20010918; JP 2009118863 A 20090604; JP 2013143958 A 20130725

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100908

2006-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030804

2004-08-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENE LOGIC INC.

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030804

2001-08-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENE LOGIC ACQUISITION CORP.

2000-07-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MURPHY, PATRICIA, D.

2000-07-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WHITE, MARGA, B.

2000-07-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RABIN, MARK, B.

2000-07-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OLSON, SHERI, J.

2000-07-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YOSHIKAWA, MATTHEW

2000-07-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JACKSON, GEOFFREY, M.

2000-07-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ESKANDARI, TARA

2000-07-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHRYER, BRENDA

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000215

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE