Global Patent Index - EP 0994971 A1

EP 0994971 A1 2000-04-26 - ROTATING MECHANISM WITH ARM

Title (en)

ROTATING MECHANISM WITH ARM

Title (de)

SCHWENKVORRICHTUNG MIT AUSLEGER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PIVOTEMENT MUNI D'UN BRAS PIVOTANT

Publication

EP 0994971 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98939615 A

Priority

  • EP 9804129 W
  • LU 90093 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9904044A1] The invention relates to a device for rotating a work element, comprising an arm (20), a support structure (18), said arm (20) being mounted in said support structure in such a way that it can rotate, a rotation drive (50) for rotating the arm (20) around an rotation pin (22), said rotation drive (50) being located between the arm (20) and the support structure (18), and a lifting drive (28). The support structure (18) represents the frame and the arm (20) represents the driven member of a gear. The lifting drive (28) closes this gear between the support structure (18) and the arm (20). A coupling device is connected in series with the lifting drive (28) in such a way that said lifting drive (28) can be uncoupled from the gear. Said coupling device may comprise a rotating arm (38) and a locking device (62) for example. The inventive device can be used advantageously as an especially compact rotating device for carrying a blast furnace gun.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21B 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21B 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21B 7/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9904044A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9904044 A1 19990128; AT 206767 T 20011015; AU 8806198 A 19990210; BR 9810889 A 20000926; CN 1075115 C 20011121; CN 1263562 A 20000816; DE 59801701 D1 20011115; EP 0994971 A1 20000426; EP 0994971 B1 20011010; HK 1027599 A1 20020208; KR 20010021763 A 20010315; LU 90093 A2 19990118; US 6248288 B1 20010619

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050704

2003-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020704

2003-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2002-10-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020704

2002-07-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020704

2002-01-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020104

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801701 20011115

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT

2001-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 206767 T 20011015

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010110

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991224

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT