Global patent index - EP 0994972 A1

EP 0994972 A1 2000-04-26 - STEELWORKS CONVERTER WITH CONE COOLING SYSTEM

Title (en)

STEELWORKS CONVERTER WITH CONE COOLING SYSTEM

Title (de)

STAHLWERKSKONVERTER MIT HUTKÜHLUNG

Title (fr)

CONVERTISSEUR D'USINE SIDERURGIQUE AVEC SYSTEME DE REFROIDISSEMENT DU BEC DU CONVERTISSEUR

Publication

EP 0994972 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936179 A

Priority

  • DE 9801634 W
  • DE 19730250 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19730250C1] A steelworks converter has a cone cooling system with sinuous ducts for carrying the cooling medium which open into at least one groove-like collector in the top and bottom regions of the converter head, as well as at least one cooling medium supply and discharge. According to the invention, a collecting pipe (24) is arranged in the region of the lower collector (22), the collecting pipe (24) is spaced apart from at least one of the side walls of the lower collector, the collecting pipe (24) has at least one closable discharge (27) and is in communication with the lower collector (22) so that the cooling medium (W) inside the collector (22) can flow into the collecting pipe (24).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21C 5/46; F27D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21C 5/42 (2006.01); F27D 9/00 (2006.01); C21C 5/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27D 9/00 (2013.01); C21C 5/42 (2013.01); C21C 5/4646 (2013.01); F27D 2009/0027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9902740A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19730250 C1 19980806; AT 204340 T 20010915; AU 8532098 A 19990208; BR 9810553 A 20000815; CN 1082547 C 20020410; CN 1262708 A 20000809; EP 0994972 A1 20000426; EP 0994972 B1 20010816; ES 2159437 T3 20011001; US 6277325 B1 20010821; WO 9902740 A1 19990121

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-09-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59801223

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-09-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59801223

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ANWALTSKANZLEI MEISSNER & MEISSNER, DE

2004-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030616

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2003-06-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030616

2002-08-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-06-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020613

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020611

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2159437

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-09-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801223

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-09-20

2001-09-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-08-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 204340

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010110

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000106

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT