Global Patent Index - EP 0994987 A1

EP 0994987 A1 2000-04-26 - BUCKET WHEEL MACHINERY

Title (en)

BUCKET WHEEL MACHINERY

Title (de)

SCHAUFELRADGERÄT

Title (fr)

EXCAVATRICE ROTATIVE

Publication

EP 0994987 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936257 A

Priority

  • DE 9801773 W
  • DE 19729548 A
  • DE 19737858 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6369376B1] A conveyor is described which includes, for example, a bucket wheel arranged on a jib for reducing especially compressed stockpiles or, respectively, for piling up bulk goods, conveyor is constructed so as to pick up or pile up piled-up bulk goods. The conveyor includes a measuring device for measuring the surface profile of the stockpile device. The conveyor is associated with a control device which is constructed so as to move the conveyor automatically to the desired removal or, respectively, piling-up position in dependence on the measured stockpile surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 3/26; E02F 3/18; E02F 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/26 (2006.01); E02F 9/20 (2006.01); E02F 9/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/26 (2013.01); E02F 3/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9902788A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE NL

EPO simple patent family

US 6369376 B1 20020409; AU 737192 B2 20010809; AU 8533598 A 19990208; BR 9811673 A 20000919; CA 2295634 A1 19990121; CA 2295634 C 20071127; EP 0994987 A1 20000426; EP 0994987 B1 20020410; WO 9902788 A1 19990121

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160602

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-02-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-12-13 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20060810

2003-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ABB PATENT GMBH

2003-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: VOEST-ALPINE MATERIALS HANDLING GMBH & CO KG

2003-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ABB PATENT GMBH

2003-03-05 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ABB PATENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20021212

2003-03-05 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: VOEST-ALPINE MATERIALS HANDLING GMBH & CO KG

- Effective date: 20030108

2003-02-05 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ABB PATENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20021212

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803751 20020516

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE NL

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010807

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE NL