Global Patent Index - EP 0994994 A1

EP 0994994 A1 2000-04-26 - PANELS FOR CONSTRUCTING SWIMMING POOLS

Title (en)

PANELS FOR CONSTRUCTING SWIMMING POOLS

Title (de)

PANEELE FÜR EINE SCHWIMMBADWAND

Title (fr)

PANNEAUX POUR LA REALISATION DE BASSINS DE PISCINES

Publication

EP 0994994 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98933746 A

Priority

  • FR 9801376 W
  • FR 9708986 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2765909A1] The invention concerns panels for constructing swimming pools having a prefabricated structure (1) of general rectangular shape with a peripheral frame defining the vertical wings (1a and 1b) to be assembled with adjacent panels, characterised in that one of the vertical wings (1a) has over its whole height centring and sealing means consisting of a section (1e) overlapping the outer surface of said wing (1a) and has laterally a sealing lip (1f), said section co-operating with a matching hollow shape (1g) the of the other wing (1b), the section (1e) and the hollow shape (1g) having a very substantially triangular cross-section, and catching means for quick assembly (1j), co-operating with matching means (1k) of the other wing (1b).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 4/00 (2006.01); E04H 4/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 4/0081 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9902802A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2765909 A1 19990115; FR 2765909 B1 19990910; AR 016765 A1 20010801; AT 222314 T 20020815; AU 731801 B2 20010405; AU 8345998 A 19990208; BR 9815509 A 20001031; CA 2295943 A1 19990121; CA 2295943 C 20061024; CN 1104544 C 20030402; CN 1267351 A 20000920; CZ 295581 B6 20050817; CZ 9904766 A3 20000614; DE 69807232 D1 20020919; DE 69807232 T2 20030417; EG 21265 A 20010530; EP 0994994 A1 20000426; EP 0994994 B1 20020814; ES 2178842 T3 20030101; ID 23769 A 20000511; PT 994994 E 20021231; RU 2192527 C2 20021110; TR 9903269 T2 20000421; TW 436562 B 20010528; WO 9902802 A1 19990121

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160714

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160624

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160608

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160412

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160602

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160408

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160411

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69807232

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KOENIG SZYNKA TILMANN VON RENESSE PATENTANWAEL, DE

2007-03-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2006-06-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060629

2005-05-18 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050518

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2178842

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-12-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021112

2002-12-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20020403669

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2002-10-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69807232

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-19

2002-09-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2002-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT

2002-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 222314

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011112

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991221

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT