Global Patent Index - EP 0995001 A1

EP 0995001 A1 2000-04-26 - FASTENING OF A FITTING

Title (en)

FASTENING OF A FITTING

Title (de)

BEFESTIGUNG EINES BESCHLAGTEILS

Title (fr)

FIXATION D'UNE FERRURE

Publication

EP 0995001 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936231 A

Priority

  • DE 9801688 W
  • DE 29711790 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9902808A1] A hinge part (35) for doors, windows and the like is secured by means of a hinge (30) to a frame (10, 20) which consists of profiled bars (1). The profiled bar (1) has on the fastening side an outwardly open profiled groove (4) with a C-shaped cross-section having marginal lips (7, 7') opposite one another which delimit the opening (8) of the C-shaped profiled groove (4). The fitting (35) has a fastening part (36) which engages the profiled bar (1) and to which is associated a clamping part (40) which can be tightened against the fastening part (36) by means of at least one screw (48) that extends through the opening (8) of the profiled groove (4), so as to clamp the marginal lips (7, 7') of the profiled groove (4) between the fastening part (36) and the clamping part (10). The fastening part (36) is thus fixed in the profiled groove (4) in the longitudinal direction of the profiled bar (1). The fastening part (36) lies on the outside of and extends into the first marginal lip (7) of the profiled groove (4), through the opening (8) of the profiled groove (4), and abuts on the inner side of the second, opposite marginal lip (7'). The clamping part (40) lies on the outside of and extends into the second marginal lip (7') of the profiled groove (40), through the opening (8) of the profiled groove (4), and abuts on the inner side of the first, opposite marginal lip (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/0238 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9902808A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29711790 U1 19981105; AT 234409 T 20030315; CZ 20000009 A3 20010815; CZ 297727 B6 20070314; EP 0995001 A1 20000426; EP 0995001 B1 20030312; ES 2194335 T3 20031116; PL 187650 B1 20040831; PL 337730 A1 20000828; RU 2162507 C1 20010127; WO 9902808 A1 19990121

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-01 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20030401574

- Effective date: 20110104

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59807475

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-03-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110619

2011-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HAHN G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100620

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110104

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-01-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110101

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100615

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100616

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100709

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20090601

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090709

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090603

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-12-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2194335 T3

2003-09-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-06-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-17 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030401574

2003-06-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-06-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807475 P 20030417

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT NL SE

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2002-06-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ARRANGEMENT WITH A FITTING MOUNTED ON A FRAME

2002-05-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ARRANGEMENT WITH A FITTING MOUNTED ON A FRAME

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991206

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT NL SE