Global Patent Index - EP 0995005 A1

EP 0995005 A1 2000-04-26 - OUTLET PART FOR ROLLER SHUTTER LATERAL BELT

Title (en)

OUTLET PART FOR ROLLER SHUTTER LATERAL BELT

Title (de)

SEITLICHES AUSGANGSSTÜCK FÜR EINEN ROLLADENGURT

Title (fr)

PIECE DE SORTIE DE SANGLE LATERALE POUR VOLET ROULANT

Publication

EP 0995005 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99916999 A

Priority

  • FR 9901072 W
  • FR 9806069 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2778691A1] The drive belt outlet consists of a single component (10) clipped from the outside into an aperture in the side wall (2) of the shutter housing adjacent to the flanged pulley (3) on the shutter roller (4). The outer end of the outlet component is circular and has a collar (13) with rounded edges; its middle portion is cylindrical, and its inner end (14) is partially closed, leaving a curved slot (15) for the belt (5) covering at least 180 degrees and having rounded edges.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/78 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/78 (2013.01); E06B 2009/785 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958805A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR

EPO simple patent family

FR 2778691 A1 19991119; FR 2778691 B1 20000616; DE 69911713 D1 20031106; DE 69911713 T2 20040805; EP 0995005 A1 20000426; EP 0995005 B1 20031001; PL 193988 B1 20070430; PL 340607 A1 20010212; WO 9958805 A1 19991118

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160504

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-12-12 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES

- Ref Legal Event Code: CL

2008-11-07 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES

- Ref Legal Event Code: CL

2004-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040702

2003-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69911713

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000211

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR