Global Patent Index - EP 0995009 A1

EP 0995009 A1 2000-04-26 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MEASURING THE FLOW RATE OF DRILL CUTTINGS

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MEASURING THE FLOW RATE OF DRILL CUTTINGS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES BOHRKLEINMASSENSTROMES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET METHODE DE MESURE DU DEBIT DE DEBLAIS DE FORAGE

Publication

EP 0995009 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99918027 A

Priority

  • FR 9901090 W
  • FR 9805822 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2778428A1] The invention concerns a device for measuring the flow rate of drill cuttings brought up to the surface by means of a drilling fluid, comprising means for collecting the cuttings and means for continuously weighing the collected cuttings. The means for collecting the cuttings comprise a container in the shape of a bucket (16) articulated on a shaft and means for tipping (20) the container so as to empty the bucket. The measuring means comprise a measuring cell (24) connected to the tilting means for measuring a load proportional to the weight of the collected cuttings. The invention also concerns a method for measuring drill cuttings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 21/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 21/01 (2006.01); E21B 21/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 21/01 (2013.01); E21B 21/065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9957415A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2778428 A1 19991112; FR 2778428 B1 20000804; BR 9906410 A 20000926; CA 2296003 A1 19991111; CA 2296003 C 20060502; DE 29924288 U1 20020912; DE 69916393 D1 20040519; DE 69916393 T2 20040909; DE 995009 T1 20020613; EP 0995009 A1 20000426; EP 0995009 B1 20040414; ES 2220059 T3 20041201; GB 2342673 A 20000419; GB 2342673 B 20021120; GB 9929496 D0 20000209; NO 20000068 A 20000303; NO 20000068 D0 20000106; NO 317220 B1 20040920; US 6410862 B1 20020625; WO 9957415 A1 19991111

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20170203

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2016-02-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM

- Effective date: 20150601

2015-12-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

- Effective date: 20150531

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69916393

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-09-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140512

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140411

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140510

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-05-18 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2008-11-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: GEOSERVICES EQUIPEMENTS SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20080821

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-12-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2220059

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69916393

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES IT NL

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-06-13 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991215

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES IT NL