Global Patent Index - EP 0995010 A1

EP 0995010 A1 2000-04-26 - CORE BARREL

Title (en)

CORE BARREL

Title (de)

KERNBOHRWERKZEUG

Title (fr)

CAROTTIER

Publication

EP 0995010 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98933379 A

Priority

  • BE 9800104 W
  • BE 9700590 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9902816A1] The invention concerns a core barrel, in particular in the field of oil exploration, comprising at least an outer tube (2) and a core bit (3) forming an outer assembly (4) and at least an inner tube (5) forming with a drilling core optionally present therein, and optionally with part of the groups arranged under the drilling core base, an inner assembly (7), suspension and/or guiding means being provided for maintaining the inner assembly (7) inside the outer assembly (4), the suspension and/or guiding means being further arranged such that the inner assembly (7) maintains at least perpendicular to these means (9), with respect to the outer assembly (4), a predetermined axial and/or radial and/or angular freedom of movement greater than usual.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 25/00; E21B 10/48; E21B 25/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/48 (2006.01); E21B 25/00 (2006.01); E21B 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 25/02 (2013.01); E21B 10/48 (2013.01); E21B 25/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9902816A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9902816 A1 19990121; BE 1011266 A3 19990706; CA 2295655 A1 19990121; CA 2295655 C 20070626; DE 69822466 D1 20040422; DE 69822466 T2 20050324; EP 0995010 A1 20000426; EP 0995010 B1 20040317; NO 20000057 A 20000211; NO 20000057 D0 20000106; US 6341656 B1 20020129

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150708

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150708

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-04-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150801

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150708

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69822466

2015-01-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140708

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140717

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140624

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140710

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140624

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-07-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040706

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69822466 P 20040422

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.

2003-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DII INDUSTRIES, LLC

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020124

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000128

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL