Global Patent Index - EP 0995014 A1

EP 0995014 A1 2000-04-26 - CYLINDER PISTON UNIT, ESPECIALLY FOR STEAM ENGINES

Title (en)

CYLINDER PISTON UNIT, ESPECIALLY FOR STEAM ENGINES

Title (de)

ZYLINDER-KOLBENEINHEIT, INSBESONDERE FÜR DAMPFKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

UNITE CYLINDRE-PISTON DESTINEE NOTAMMENT A UNE MACHINE A VAPEUR

Publication

EP 0995014 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936095 A

Priority

  • DE 9801517 W
  • DE 19725646 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19725646A1] The invention relates to a cylinder piston unit, especially for steam engines with expansion by heat influx, which is constructed as follows: a piston guided in the cylinder element has a displacer, a heating device is mounted on the cylinder element for the stroke area of a non-compacting displacer, the working medium is supplied in a vapour or liquid state in the area of the upper dead point, the expanded working medium is discharged at least in the area of the lower dead point. A pore burner is assigned to the cylinder piston unit in an advantageous manner. To this end, the invention provides for heat transfer sections (B, C) of a pore burner (50) which surrounds the cylinder head (43) along part of its height to be arranged at the level of the warm section (41) of the cylinder in the stroke area of the displacer (3) and at the level of the cylinder head (43).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01K 21/02; F23C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01B 29/12 (2006.01); F01K 21/02 (2006.01); F02G 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01K 21/02 (2013.01); F01B 29/12 (2013.01); F02G 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9858161A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19725646 A1 19981224; EP 0995014 A1 20000426; EP 0995014 B1 20020102; JP 2002510373 A 20020402; JP 4144812 B2 20080903; US 6247309 B1 20010619; WO 9858161 A1 19981223

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100604

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100603

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100603

2011-02-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090601

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090625

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080510

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-08-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020402

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802805 20020228

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010725

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000118

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE