Global patent index - EP 0995015 A1

EP 0995015 A1 2000-04-26 - DEVICE FOR OPERATING A GAS SHUTTLE VALVE BY MEANS OF AN ELECTROMAGNETIC ACTUATOR

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR OPERATING A GAS SHUTTLE VALVE BY MEANS OF AN ELECTROMAGNETIC ACTUATOR

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR BETÄTIGUNG EINES GASWECHSELVENTILS MIT EINEM ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN AKTUATOR

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR ACTIONNER UNE SOUPAPE D'ECHANGE DE GAZ A L'AIDE D'UN ACTUATEUR ELECTROMAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 0995015 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98939598 A

Priority

  • DE 19728479 A
  • EP 9804067 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19728479A1] The invention relates to a device for operating a gas shuttle valve by means of an electromagnetic actuator which is securely mounted in a component and which has an opening and a closing magnet, between which an axially displaceable armature is arranged. By means of a tappet, said armature acts upon a valve shaft in conjunction with a spring system and a clearance compensation member. According to the invention, the clearance compensation element is arranged between the tappet of the armature and the valve shaft.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04; F01L 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/24 (2006.01); F01L 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/24 (2013.01); F01L 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9902823A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19728479 A1 19990107; DE 19728479 C2 20010830; BR 9810671 A 20000926; CN 1109181 C 20030521; CN 1261943 A 20000802; EP 0995015 A1 20000426; EP 0995015 B1 20020918; JP 2000513423 A 20001010; JP 3513519 B2 20040331; KR 100396383 B1 20030902; US 6502804 B1 20030107; WO 9902823 A1 19990121

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130729

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-12-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PATENTPORTFOLIO 2 S. A. R. L., LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59805629

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111013

2008-09-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2008-09-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805629

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-24

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010330

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991120

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT